This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/08/2022 at 10:42:52 (UTC).

Workman v. Village of Woodmere et al

Case Summary

On 12/10/2021 Workman filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Village of Woodmere. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02325

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph Workman

Defendants

Village of Woodmere

Christopher Colon

Woodmere Chief of Police

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cathleen M. Bolek

Attorney at Bolek Besser Glesius

5885 Landerbrook Drive

Cleveland, OH 44124

Matthew D. Besser

Attorney at Bolek Besser Glesius

302 Monarch Centre, 5885 Landerbrook Drive

Cleveland, OH 44124

Defendant Attorneys

Edmond Z. Jaber

Attorney at Mazanec Raskin Ryder

34305 Solon Road

Cleveland, OH 44139

Frank Consolo

Attorney at Consolo Law

627 West St. Clair Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44113

James A. Climer

Attorney at Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder - Cleveland

100 Franklin'S Row, 34305 Solon Road

Cleveland, OH 44139

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet

#2

(#2) Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided, no summons issued. (L,Ja) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#3

(#3) Attorney Appearance by James A. Climer filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Climer, James) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#4

(#4) Attorney Appearance of Additional Counsel by Edmond Z. Jaber filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Jaber, Edmond) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

Exhibit A, Woodmere waiver of service

5 #2

Exhibit B, Mason waiver of service

5 #3

Exhibit C, Colon waiver of service

#6

(#6) Amended complaint against All Defendants. Filed by Joseph Workman. (Besser, Matthew) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketRemark by Finance. Funds in the amount of $402.00 refunded on 01/21/2022 for receipt AOHNDC-11174874. (K,Ve) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Amended complaint against All Defendants. Filed by Joseph Workman. (Besser, Matthew) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Waiver of Service Returned Executed on all defendants, waivers sent on 1/3/2022, answers due 3/4/2022 filed on behalf of Joseph Workman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Woodmere waiver of service, #2 Exhibit B, Mason waiver of service, #3 Exhibit C, Colon waiver of service)(Besser, Matthew) Modified text on 1/7/2022 (S,SR). (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Attorney Appearance of Additional Counsel by Edmond Z. Jaber filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Jaber, Edmond) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Attorney Appearance by James A. Climer filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Climer, James) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided, no summons issued. (L,Ja) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (L,Ja) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketJudge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case. (L,Ja) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketRequest to Clerk for refund of erroneous or duplicate on-line filing fee payment. Reason for refund request: duplicate filing fee. Receipt #: AOHNDC-11174874, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Besser, Matthew) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 402.00 Receipt number AOHNDC-11174874. Filed by Joseph Workman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet ) (Besser, Matthew) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edmond Z. Jaber

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frank Consolo

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James A. Climer