This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/16/2022 at 09:42:10 (UTC).

Workforce Defense League v. Clayco, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/17/2022 Workforce Defense League filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Clayco, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John A. Mendez and Deborah Barnes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00502

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Mendez

Referral Judge

Deborah Barnes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Workforce Defense League

Defendants

Clayco, Inc.

United Contractor Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrea Matsuoka

Ezekiel Daystar Carder

Matthew J. Gauger

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel Edward Richardson

Michael John Nader

 

Court Documents

10 #4

Request for Judicial Notice

10 #3

Proposed Order

10 #2

Declaration of Richardson

10 #1

Memorandum

10 #10

Main Document

9 #1

Proof of Service

9 #9

Main Document

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Compliance with 28 USC section 1446(D) by Clayco, Inc., United Contractor Services, LLC. (Richardson, Daniel) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME to respond to the Complaint by Clayco, Inc., United Contractor Services, LLC. (Richardson, Daniel) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

#6

(#6) RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/21/2022 RELATING CASE(s) #5 2:22-CV-502 JAM DB, and 2:22-CV-503 MCE DB REASSIGNING CASE 2:22-CV-503 to District Judge John A. Mendez for all further proceedings. Any dates currently set in this reassigned case only are hereby VACATED. Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. no longer assigned to case. New Case Number: 2:22-CV-503 JAM DB. (Reader, L) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:22-cv-00503-MCE-DB by Clayco, Inc., United Contractor Services, LLC. (Richardson, Daniel) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

4 #3

VDRP

4 #2

Order re Filing Requirements

4 #1

Consent Form

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant United Contractor Services, LLC. (Richardson, Daniel) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Clayco, Inc.. (Richardson, Daniel) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

1 #7

Declaration Dec of Arnotti iso Removal

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to DISMISS by Clayco, Inc., United Contractor Services, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 6/28/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Richardson, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Request for Judicial Notice)(Richardson, Daniel) Modified on 4/28/2022 (Zignago, K.). (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Workforce Defense League. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Matsuoka, Andrea) Modified on 4/13/2022 (Huang, H). (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Compliance with 28 USC section 1446(D) by Clayco, Inc., United Contractor Services, LLC. (Richardson, Daniel) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME to respond to the Complaint by Clayco, Inc., United Contractor Services, LLC. (Richardson, Daniel) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/21/2022 RELATING CASE(s) #5 2:22-CV-502 JAM DB, and 2:22-CV-503 MCE DB REASSIGNING CASE 2:22-CV-503 to District Judge John A. Mendez for all further proceedings. Any dates currently set in this reassigned case only are hereby VACATED. Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. no longer assigned to case. New Case Number: 2:22-CV-503 JAM DB. (Reader, L) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:22-cv-00503-MCE-DB by Clayco, Inc., United Contractor Services, LLC. (Richardson, Daniel) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Kaminski, H) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant United Contractor Services, LLC. (Richardson, Daniel) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Clayco, Inc.. (Richardson, Daniel) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2022-00314822 by All Defendants. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10129183) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Complaint, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proofs of Personal Service, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Declaration of D. Richardson, #7 Declaration of B. Arnotti , #8 Declaration of S. Siedhaus, #9 Declaration of F. Sciullo)(Richardson, Daniel. (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less