This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/14/2021 at 01:14:44 (UTC).

Woolridge v. Walmart Stores Inc et al

Case Summary

On 09/30/2020 Woolridge filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Walmart Stores Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy M Cain. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-03461

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy M Cain

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Helen B Woolridge

Defendants

Walmart Stores East LP

Walmart Stores Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chad L Bacon

Attorney at Foster and Foster

Po Box 2123

Greenville, SC 29602

Defendant Attorneys

Vordman Carlisle Traywick

Attorney at Robinson Gray Stepp and Laffitte LLC

1310 Gadsden Street

Columbia, SC 29201

John M Montgomery

Attorney at Robinson Gray Stepp and Laffitte LLC

1310 Gadsden Street

Columbia, SC 29201

Rachel M Hutchens

Attorney at Robinson Gray Stepp and Laffitte LLC

1310 Gadsden Street

Columbia, SC 29201

Rebecca Laffitte

Attorney at Robinson Gray Stepp and Laffitte LLC

1310 Gadsden Street

Columbia, SC 29201

 

Court Documents

#20

#18

17 #1

Proposed Order Consent Confidentiality Order

#17

#16

#14

#13

#12

#11

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

#9

#8

#7

4 #1

Certificate of Service

#4

3 #1

Certificate of Service

#3

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 3/8/21. (kmca) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER granting #17 Consent Motion for Confidentiality Order. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 1/19/21.(kmca) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Consent MOTION for Confidentiality Order by Walmart Stores East LP, Walmart Stores Inc. Response to Motion due by 2/2/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Consent Confidentiality Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Montgomery, John) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Walmart Stores East LP, Walmart Stores Inc(Montgomery, John) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Helen B Woolridge(Bacon, Chad) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Statement/Certification due by 11/17/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/22/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/20/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/25/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 5/25/2021, Discovery due by 7/2/2021, Mediation Due by 7/16/2021, Motions due by 7/23/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 8/23/2021 or sixty (60) days after dispositive motions have been resolved. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 11/13/20. (kmca) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Walmart Stores East LP, Walmart Stores Inc, Helen B Woolridge.(Montgomery, John) Modified on 11/10/2020: to add joint filer as listed (kmca). (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Joint Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Walmart Stores East LP, Walmart Stores Inc, Helen B Woolridge.(Montgomery, John) Modified on 11/10/2020: to add joint filer as listed (kmca). (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Walmart Stores East LP, Walmart Stores Inc, Helen B Woolridge. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Montgomery, John) Modified on 11/10/2020: to ad joint filer as listed (kmca). (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/12/2020: to replace with corrected document (Judge's form) as provided by filing user) (kmca). (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEDIATION ORDER. Mediation Due by 3/29/2021. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 10/7/20. (kmca) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/27/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 11/10/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 11/10/2020, ADR Statement/Certification due by 11/10/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/21/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/20/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/19/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/19/2021, Discovery due by 3/22/2021, Motions due by 4/5/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 6/7/2021 or sixty (60) days after dispositive motions have been resolved. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 10/7/20. (kmca) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Helen B Woolridge.(Bacon, Chad) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Walmart Stores East LP, Walmart Stores Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(kmca) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Walmart Stores East LP, Walmart Stores Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(kmca) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Greenwood County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-24-00748. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-9377118), filed by Walmart Stores East LP, Walmart Stores Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Certificate of Service)(kmca) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chad L Bacon