This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/19/2021 at 10:09:21 (UTC).

Woolard Brothers Commercial Contracting, Inc. v. Mal LP et al

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 Woolard Brothers Commercial Contracting, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Mal LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen Michael Doyle and R. Austin Huffaker, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00146

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Stephen Michael Doyle

Presiding Judge

R. Austin Huffaker, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Woolard Brothers Commercial Contracting, Inc.

Defendants

Love Funding Corporation

Mal LP

WDG Construction and Development Services, Inc. doing business as WDG Construction Group

The Guarantee Company of North America USA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey Gerald Tickal

Attorney at Gullage & Tickal, LLP

511 Geneva Street

Opelika, AL 36801

Defendant Attorneys

Larry Stephen Logsdon

Attorney at Wallace Jordan Ratliff & Brandt, LLC

Po Box 530910

Birmingham, AL 35253

Walter Joseph McCorkle, Jr.

Attorney at Balch & Bingham

P O Box 78

Montgomery, AL 36101-0078

Charles Alan Burkhart

Attorney at Balch & Bingham LLP

Po Box 306

Birmingham, AL 35203-4642

Joel Scott Dickens

Attorney at Webster Henry Bradwell Cohan Speagle & DeShazo PC

Two Perimeter Park South; Suite 445 East

Birmingham, AL 35243

John Curtis Deshazo

Attorney at Webster, Henry, Bradwell, Cohan, Speagle & DeShazo, P.C.

Two Perimeter Park South, Suite 445 East

Birmingham, AL 35243

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) STANDARD BRIEFING ORDER: Briefing deadlines and instructions for all pending and future motions. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 4/8/2021. (am, ) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

#24

(#24) UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: setting a Pretrial Conference for 3/24/2022 @ 9:30 AM, before Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker Jr, in CR 2D, FMJ US Courthouse, Montgomery, AL; DIRECTING the parties to jointly prepare a Proposed Pretrial Order on or before 3/17/2022; Non-Jury Trial set for 5/9/2022 @ 10:00 AM, before Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker Jr., in Montgomery, AL; Dispositive & Daubert Motions due by 10/25/2021; Mediation Notice due not more than 5 days after the settlement conference; Amendments to Pleadings due by 6/11/2021; Discovery cutoff completed by 9/24/2021, as further set out in Order. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 4/8/2021. (Furnished: Calendar & DH)(am, ) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

#23

(#23) ORDER granting #13 Motion to Dismiss; Dft Love Funding Corporation is hereby DISMISSED as a party to this action. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 4/6/2021. (bes, ) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

#22

(#22) RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Woolard Brothers Commercial Contracting, Inc.. (Tickal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

#19

(#19) Case reassigned to Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr as presiding judge and Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle as referral judge; Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle no longer assigned to the case as referral judge. (bes, ) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

#18

(#18) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Dickens, Joel) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

17 #1

Corrected Certificate of Service

#17

(#17) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Woolard Brothers Commercial Contracting, Inc.. (Tickal, Jeffrey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/16/2021: #1 Corrected Certificate of Service) (amf, ). (Entered: 03/15/2021)

#13

Motions No Longer Referred: #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, ) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

1 #14

Receipt

1 #13

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #12

Exhibit 11

1 #10

Exhibit 10 - St Court Record

1 #9

Exhibit 9 - Consent Love

1 #8

Exhibit 8 - Consent The Guarantee Company

1 #7

Exhibit 7 - Consent wdg

1 #4

Exhibit 4

#1

(#2) NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal in State Court by Mal LP re #1 Notice of Removal.(bes, ) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) STANDARD BRIEFING ORDER: Briefing deadlines and instructions for all pending and future motions. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 4/8/2021. (am, ) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: setting a Pretrial Conference for 3/24/2022 @ 9:30 AM, before Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker Jr, in CR 2D, FMJ US Courthouse, Montgomery, AL; DIRECTING the parties to jointly prepare a Proposed Pretrial Order on or before 3/17/2022; Non-Jury Trial set for 5/9/2022 @ 10:00 AM, before Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker Jr., in Montgomery, AL; Dispositive & Daubert Motions due by 10/25/2021; Mediation Notice due not more than 5 days after the settlement conference; Amendments to Pleadings due by 6/11/2021; Discovery cutoff completed by 9/24/2021, as further set out in Order. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 4/8/2021. (Furnished: Calendar & DH)(am, ) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER granting #13 Motion to Dismiss; Dft Love Funding Corporation is hereby DISMISSED as a party to this action. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 4/6/2021. (bes, ) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Woolard Brothers Commercial Contracting, Inc.. (Tickal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) TEXT ORDER: On 3/17/2021, the Court issued an order requiring the Plaintiff to show cause on or by 3/24/21 as to why Defendant Love Funding's #13 Motion To Dismiss should not be granted. Despite the Court's order, the Plaintiff has not responded. Accordingly, if the Plaintiff fails to file an objection/response on or by 3/31/2021, the Court will presume that Plaintiff does not oppose Love's motion. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 3/29/2021. (No PDF attached to this entry)(bes, ) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff shall show cause on or by 3/24/2021 as to why Defendant Love Funding's #13 Motion to Dismiss should not be granted. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 3/17/2021. (No PDF attached to this entry)(bes, ) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Case reassigned to Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr as presiding judge and Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle as referral judge; Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle no longer assigned to the case as referral judge. (bes, ) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions No Longer Referred: #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, ) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Dickens, Joel) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Woolard Brothers Commercial Contracting, Inc.. (Tickal, Jeffrey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/16/2021: #1 Corrected Certificate of Service) (amf, ). (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Respond to Complaint by Mal LP. (McCorkle, Walter) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: It is ORDERED that the parties shall file their Rule 26(f) report as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/15/2021; Any party wishing to consent shall complete the attached form and return it to the Clerk of Court on or before 3/15/2021; Do NOT electronically file the consent form nor the reassignment form into the record. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 2/22/2021. (bes, ) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (ALL PARTIES) Love Funding Corporation, Mal LP, The Guarantee Company of North America USA, WDG Construction and Development Services, Inc., Woolard Brothers Commercial Contracting, Inc. (bes, ) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Mal LP. (bes, ) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal in State Court by Mal LP re #1 Notice of Removal.(bes, ) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConsent to Removal by Love Funding Corporation. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 -9 for PDF) (bes, ) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConsent to Removal by The Guarantee Company of North America USA. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 -8 for PDF) (bes, ) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConsent to Removal by WDG Construction and Development Services, Inc. (No PDF attached to this entry - See Doc #1 -7 for PDF) (bes, ) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT against Love Funding Corporation, Mal LP, The Guarantee Company of North America USA, WDG Construction and Development Services, Inc., filed by Woolard Brothers Commercial Contracting, Inc.. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 for PDF)(bes, ) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mal LP from Circuit Court of Montgomery, Alabama, case number 03-CV-21-900044.00. ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 4602061607) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - St Cmp, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7 - Consent wdg, #8 Exhibit 8 - Consent The Guarantee Company, #9 Exhibit 9 - Consent Love, #10 Exhibit 10 - St Court Record, #11 Exhibit 10A - St Court Case Summary, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Receipt)(bes, ) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WDG Construction and Development Services, Inc. doing business as WDG Construction Group is a litigant

Latest cases where M.A.L. is a litigant

Latest cases where Love Funding Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where The Guarantee Company of North America USA is a litigant