Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/05/2019 at 07:24:54 (UTC).

Woody et al v. Jasper County Animal Rescue et al

Case Summary

On 01/04/2019 Woody filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Jasper County Animal Rescue. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Helen C. Adams, Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger, Celeste F. Bremer and Stephanie M. Rose. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00007

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judges

Helen C. Adams

Celeste F. Bremer

Presiding Judges

Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger

Stephanie M. Rose

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

David Woody

D.A. J.

E. W.

Kendra Jackson

D.E. J.

K. W.

L. W.

K.W.

L.W.

D.E.J.

E.W.

D.A.J.

Defendants

Janice Bragg, Emp. & Indiv.

Marc Headdington, Emp. & Indiv.

Jasper County Animal Rescue

Jasper County Sheriff John Halferty, Emp. & Indiv.

Jacob Halferty, Emp. & Indiv.

Jasper County Sheriff

Janice Bragg

Jacob Halferty

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jaysen Christopher McCleary

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW, JAYSEN MCCLEARY

4807 Kingman Boulevard

Des Moines, IA 50311

Defendant Attorneys

Jason C Palmer

Attorney at BRADSHAW FOWLER PROCTOR & FAIRGRAVE, P.C.

801 Grand Ave, Suite 3700

Des Moines, IA 50309

Allison J. Frederick

Attorney at CARMONEY LAW FIRM, PLLC

2400 Nw 86Th Street, Suite 25

Des Moines, IA 50322

Jack William Leverenz

Attorney at CARMONEY LAW FIRM, PLLC

2400 Nw 86Th Street, Suite 25

Des Moines, IA 50322

Kent A Gummert

Attorney at LEDERER WESTON CRAIG PLC

4401 Westown Parkway, Suite 212

West Des Moines, IA 50266

Julie Jean Bussanmas

Attorney at POLK COUNTY ATTORNEY

111 Court Ave, 340 Polk County Admin Bldg

Des Moines, IA 50309-0515

 

Court Documents

16 #1

Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss

#16

(#16) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 41(b) and Motion Pursuant to Local Rule 7(f) by Jacob Halferty, Jasper County Sheriff. Responses due by 2/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Palmer, Jason) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

15 #1

Brief in Support of Resistance to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand Due to Proce

#15

(#15) RESPONSE to Motion re #12 First MOTION to Remand to State Court removal is defective Resistance filed by Jacob Halferty, Marc Headdington, Jasper County Sheriff. Replies due by 2/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Resistance to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand Due to Procedural Defect)(Palmer, Jason) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Consent(s) by Jasper County Sheriff (Palmer, Jason) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Consent(s) by Jasper County Animal Rescue (Frederick, Allison) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

#12

(#12) First MOTION to Remand to State Court removal is defective by D.A.J., D.E.J., E.W., Kendra Jackson, K.W., L.W., David Woody. Responses due by 2/19/2019. (McCleary, Jaysen) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Allison J. Frederick on behalf of Jasper County Animal Rescue (Frederick, Allison) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

#10

(#10) TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss to and including February 7, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 1/23/2019. (mlr) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

#9

(#9) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE TO DEFS MOTIONS TO DISMISS by David Woody.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 2/6/2019. (McCleary, Jaysen) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

8 #1

Memorandum in Support

#8

(#8) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Janice Bragg. Responses due by 1/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Bussanmas, Julie) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Consent(s) by Janice Bragg Consent to Removal (Bussanmas, Julie) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Kent A Gummert on behalf of Janice Bragg (Gummert, Kent) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

5 #1

Brief in Support

#5

(#5) MOTION to Dismiss Pre-Answer Motion to Dismiss by Jasper County Sheriff Department and by Jacob Halferty. Responses due by 1/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Palmer, Jason) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Marc Headdington, Jasper County Sheriff.(Palmer, Jason) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by Jasper County Animal Rescue.(Leverenz, Jack) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 41(b) and Motion Pursuant to Local Rule 7(f) by Jacob Halferty, Jasper County Sheriff. Responses due by 2/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Palmer, Jason) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) RESPONSE to Motion re #12 First MOTION to Remand to State Court removal is defective Resistance filed by Jacob Halferty, Marc Headdington, Jasper County Sheriff. Replies due by 2/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Resistance to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand Due to Procedural Defect)(Palmer, Jason) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Consent(s) by Jasper County Sheriff (Palmer, Jason) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Consent(s) by Jasper County Animal Rescue (Frederick, Allison) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) First MOTION to Remand to State Court removal is defective by D.A.J., D.E.J., E.W., Kendra Jackson, K.W., L.W., David Woody. Responses due by 2/19/2019. (McCleary, Jaysen) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Allison J. Frederick on behalf of Jasper County Animal Rescue (Frederick, Allison) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss to and including February 7, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 1/23/2019. (mlr) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE TO DEFS MOTIONS TO DISMISS by David Woody.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 2/6/2019. (McCleary, Jaysen) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Janice Bragg. Responses due by 1/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Bussanmas, Julie) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Consent(s) by Janice Bragg Consent to Removal (Bussanmas, Julie) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Kent A Gummert on behalf of Janice Bragg (Gummert, Kent) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Dismiss Pre-Answer Motion to Dismiss by Jasper County Sheriff Department and by Jacob Halferty. Responses due by 1/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Palmer, Jason) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Marc Headdington, Jasper County Sheriff.(Palmer, Jason) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to Complaint by Jasper County Animal Rescue.(Leverenz, Jack) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Jean Bussanmas on behalf of Janice Bragg (Bussanmas, Julie) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Judge Stephanie M. Rose and Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer added. Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams and Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger no longer assigned to case. (don) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Marc Headdington, Emp. & Indiv., Jacob Halferty, Emp. & Indiv., Jasper County Sheriff John Halferty, Emp. & Indiv. from Iowa District Court for Jasper County, case number LACV121167. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3691026., filed by Marc Headdington, Emp. & Indiv., Jacob Halferty, Emp. & Indiv., Jasper County Sheriff John Halferty, Emp. & Indiv.. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 4/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court Filings)(Palmer, Jason) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where L.W. is a litigant

Latest cases where Jasper County Sheriffs Department is a litigant

Latest cases where EW is a litigant

Latest cases where KW 1901 NEWPORT PARKING ASSOCIATES, IN is a litigant