Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/28/2020 at 08:56:09 (UTC).

Woodward v. Camden County Jail et al

Case Summary

On 04/29/2020 Woodward filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Camden County Jail. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Benjamin W. Cheesbro and Lisa G. Wood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00044

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Benjamin W. Cheesbro

Presiding Judge

Lisa G. Wood

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Woodward

Defendants

Camden County Jail

Officer FNU McPherson

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Robert Woodward. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 5/20/20. (slt) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

7 #1

Envelope

#7

(#7) DEMAND for Trial by Jury to include relief by Robert Woodward. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ca) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

6 #1

Envelope

#6

(#6) CONSENT by Prisoner Robert Woodward to collection of fees. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ca) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. PLRA due by 6/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 05/01/2020. (MG) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

3 #1

Envelope

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert Woodward. Responses due by 5/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (MG) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint. Compliance due by 5/13/2020. (MG) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

1 #2

Envelope

1 #1

Inmate Grievance Form

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Robert Woodward. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Grievance Form, #2 Envelope) (MG) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketFiling fee payment received, Amount $50.00, Receipt BWK009554. (csr) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketFiling fee payment received, Amount $35.00, Receipt BWK009553. (csr) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Robert Woodward. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 5/20/20. (slt) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DEMAND for Trial by Jury to include relief by Robert Woodward. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ca) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT by Prisoner Robert Woodward to collection of fees. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ca) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Robert Woodward. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ca) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. PLRA due by 6/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 05/01/2020. (MG) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert Woodward. Responses due by 5/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (MG) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint. Compliance due by 5/13/2020. (MG) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Robert Woodward. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Grievance Form, #2 Envelope) (MG) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less