This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/01/2021 at 07:45:55 (UTC).

Woodson v. City of Chicago, The et al

Case Summary

On 09/02/2021 Woodson filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Chicago, The. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrea R. Wood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-04707

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrea R. Wood

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jarrad Woodson

Chicago, IL 60657

Defendants

City of Chicago, The

Chicago Police Department

Phillip Fox

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Danielle Marie Alvarez

Attorney at City Of Chicago Department Of Law

2 N Lasalle Street Suite 420

Chicago, IL 60602

Caroline Jane Fronczak

Attorney at City of Chicago, Department of Law

2 N. La Salle Street, Suite 420

Chicago, IL 60602

Mark David Winistorfer

Attorney at City of Chicago, Department of Law

2 N. Lasalle Street, Suite 420

Chicago, IL 60602

Jennifer Kristine Bagby

Attorney at City Of Chicago Department Of Law

2 N Lasalle, Suite 9420

Chicago, IL 60602

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#5

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jarrad Woodson as to Chicago Police Department on 9/7/2021, answer due 9/28/2021; City of Chicago, The on 9/7/2021, answer due 9/28/2021; Phillip Fox on 9/7/2021, answer due 9/28/2021. (ph, ) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago, The by Danielle Marie Alvarez (Alvarez, Danielle) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

#8

(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Telephonic initial status hearing set for 10/26/2021 at 10:00 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (dal, ) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

#9

(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago, The by Caroline Jane Fronczak (Fronczak, Caroline) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#10

(#10) MOTION by Defendants City of Chicago, The, Phillip Fox for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead, Unopposed (Alvarez, Danielle) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

#11

(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Defendant City of Chicago's first unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #10 is granted. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 10/28/2021. Mailed notice (dal, ) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

#12

(#12) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Phillip Fox by Jennifer Kristine Bagby (Bagby, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

#13

(#13) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Phillip Fox by Mark David Winistorfer (Winistorfer, Mark) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#14

(#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Telephonic status hearing held on 10/26/2021. Over Plaintiff's objection and for the reasons stated on the record, the Court grants Defendants additional time until 11/4/2021 to respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Defendants shall have until 11/4/2021 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. The Court sets the following briefing schedule on Defendants' anticipated motions to dismiss: Defendants shall file their anticipated motions to dismiss by 11/4/2021. Plaintiff shall respond by 11/30/2021. Defendants shall reply by 12/14/2021. Defendants shall respond in writing to Plaintiff's settlement demand by 11/5/2021. The parties are directed to meet and confer and, by 11/18/2021, file a joint status report setting forth: (1) a proposed discovery schedule including a date for the exchange of Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) initial disclosures, what discovery is needed, and deadlines for the completion of discovery; (2) the parties' views regarding prospects for settlement and whether they request a referral to the magistrate judge for a settlement conference; and (3) whether the parties require a telephonic status hearing and, if so, what matters the parties feel it would be helpful to discuss with the Court. Mailed notice (dal, ) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Telephonic status hearing held on 10/26/2021. Over Plaintiff's objection and for the reasons stated on the record, the Court grants Defendants additional time until 11/4/2021 to respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Defendants shall have until 11/4/2021 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. The Court sets the following briefing schedule on Defendants' anticipated motions to dismiss: Defendants shall file their anticipated motions to dismiss by 11/4/2021. Plaintiff shall respond by 11/30/2021. Defendants shall reply by 12/14/2021. Defendants shall respond in writing to Plaintiff's settlement demand by 11/5/2021. The parties are directed to meet and confer and, by 11/18/2021, file a joint status report setting forth: (1) a proposed discovery schedule including a date for the exchange of Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) initial disclosures, what discovery is needed, and deadlines for the completion of discovery; (2) the parties' views regarding prospects for settlement and whether they request a referral to the magistrate judge for a settlement conference; and (3) whether the parties require a telephonic status hearing and, if so, what matters the parties feel it would be helpful to discuss with the Court. Mailed notice (dal, ) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Phillip Fox by Mark David Winistorfer (Winistorfer, Mark) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Phillip Fox by Jennifer Kristine Bagby (Bagby, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Defendant City of Chicago's first unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #10 is granted. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 10/28/2021. Mailed notice (dal, ) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION by Defendants City of Chicago, The, Phillip Fox for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead, Unopposed (Alvarez, Danielle) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago, The by Caroline Jane Fronczak (Fronczak, Caroline) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Telephonic initial status hearing set for 10/26/2021 at 10:00 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (dal, ) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago, The by Danielle Marie Alvarez (Alvarez, Danielle) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jarrad Woodson as to Chicago Police Department on 9/7/2021, answer due 9/28/2021; City of Chicago, The on 9/7/2021, answer due 9/28/2021; Phillip Fox on 9/7/2021, answer due 9/28/2021. (ph, ) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, ) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Chicago Police Department, City of Chicago, The, Phillip Fox. (ec, ) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Jarrad Woodson (ec, ) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (ec, ) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Jarrad Woodson; Jury Demand. (ec, ) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chicago Police Department is a litigant