This case was last updated from PACER on 12/12/2020 at 09:08:32 (UTC).

Woods v. Werner Enterprises, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 10/13/2020 Woods filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Werner Enterprises, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are CJ Williams and Mark A Roberts. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-03047

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CJ Williams

Referral Judge

Mark A Roberts

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alicia Woods

Defendants

Earl Pratt

Werner Enterprises

Werner Enterprises, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shannon M Henson

Attorney at Hope Law Firm

1055 Jordan Creek Parkway, Suite 200

West Des Moines, IA 50266

Defendant Attorneys

Aaron Jason Redinbaugh

Attorney at Finley Law Firm

699 Walnut Street, Suite 1700

Des Moines, IA 50309

Frederick Thomas Harris

Attorney at Finley Law Firm PC

699 Walnut Street, Suite 1700

Des Moines, IA 50309

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER Setting Hearing: A telephonic Rule 16(b) and 26(f) Scheduling Conference is set for 12/15/2020 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts (see text of Order for instructions). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 12/7/2020. (skm) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#7

(#7) PROPOSED Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan by Defendants Earl Pratt, Werner Enterprises, Inc (Redinbaugh, Aaron) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Werner Enterprises, Inc (Redinbaugh, Aaron) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER With Jury Demand to #3 State Court Petition by Earl Pratt.(Redinbaugh, Aaron) Modified text on 10/20/2020 (skm). (Entered: 10/19/2020)

#4

(#4) ANSWER with Jury Demand to #3 State Court Petition by Werner Enterprises, Inc.(jjh) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#3

(#3) STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand (jjh) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#2

(#2) DOCKET Annotation re #1 Notice of Removal: New case packet attached. (jjh) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

1 #9

Exhibit 8

1 #8

Exhibit 7

1 #7

Exhibit 6

1 #6

Exhibit 5

1 #5

Exhibit 4

1 #4

Exhibit 3

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Humboldt County, case number LACV018858, filed by Earl Pratt, Werner Enterprises. Scheduling Report due by 12/14/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8) (Redinbaugh, Aaron) Modified text on 10/14/2020 (jjh). (Entered: 10/14/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER Setting Hearing: A telephonic Rule 16(b) and 26(f) Scheduling Conference is set for 12/15/2020 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts (see text of Order for instructions). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 12/7/2020. (skm) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PROPOSED Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan by Defendants Earl Pratt, Werner Enterprises, Inc (Redinbaugh, Aaron) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Werner Enterprises, Inc (Redinbaugh, Aaron) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER With Jury Demand to #3 State Court Petition by Earl Pratt.(Redinbaugh, Aaron) Modified text on 10/20/2020 (skm). (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER with Jury Demand to #3 State Court Petition by Werner Enterprises, Inc.(jjh) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketSet Deadline: Defendant LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 11/3/2020. (jjh) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand (jjh) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKET Annotation re #1 Notice of Removal: New case packet attached. (jjh) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketJudge CJ Williams and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. (conflicts checked, none found) (jjh) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Humboldt County, case number LACV018858, filed by Earl Pratt, Werner Enterprises. Scheduling Report due by 12/14/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8) (Redinbaugh, Aaron) Modified text on 10/14/2020 (jjh). (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less