This case was last updated from PACER on 12/28/2019 at 08:02:15 (UTC).

Woods v. Saul

Case Summary

On 10/29/2019 Woods filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Pamela Pepper and William E Duffin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01586

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Pamela Pepper

William E Duffin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jennifer Woods

Defendant

Andrew M Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dana W Duncan

Attorney at Duncan Disability Law SC

555 Birch St

Nekoosa, WI 54457

Defendant Attorneys

Social Security Administration

Brian E Pawlak

Attorney at United States Department of Justice (ED-WI)

517 E Wisconsin Ave - Rm 530

Milwaukee, WI 53202

 

Court Documents

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 11/6/2019. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Pamela Pepper no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(cb)

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 11/1/2019 GRANTING #3 plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed without prepaying filing fee. (cc: all counsel) (cb)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; US Attorney General served on 11/13/2019. (blr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; Commissioner of Social Security served on 11/13/2019. (blr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to the parties: Plaintiff's brief due February 18, 2020; Defendant's response due March 30, 2020; Plaintiff's reply due April 15, 2020. (cc: all counsel) (blr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Transmit #1 Complaint and #5 Order via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF. (blr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 11/6/2019. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Pamela Pepper no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(cb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Andrew M Saul. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 11/1/2019 GRANTING #3 plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed without prepaying filing fee. (cc: all counsel) (cb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Jennifer Woods. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Duncan, Dana)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Jennifer Woods. (Duncan, Dana)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISCLOSURE Statement by Jennifer Woods. (Duncan, Dana)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Jennifer Woods (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Duncan, Dana)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.