This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/30/2021 at 10:48:56 (UTC).

Woods v. Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/29/2021 Woods filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Raymond P. Moore and N. Reid Neureiter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00305

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Raymond P. Moore

Referral Judge

N. Reid Neureiter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David D. Woods

Defendant

Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jordan Suzanne Coley

Attorney at Franklin D. Azar & Associates PC-Aurora

14426 East Evans Avenue

Aurora, CO 80014-1474

Elisabeth L. Owen

Attorney at Franklin D. Azar & Associates PC-Aurora

14426 East Evans Avenue

Aurora, CO 80014-1474

Defendant Attorneys

Evan Bennett Stephenson

Attorney at Spencer Fane LLP-Denver

1700 Lincoln, Suite 2000

Denver, CO 80203

Kayla L. Scroggins-Uptigrove

Attorney at Spencer Fane LLP-Denver

1700 Lincoln, Suite 2000

Denver, CO 80203

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Scroggins-Uptigrove, Kayla) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #4 Complaint Attorney Kayla L. Scroggins-Uptigrove added to party Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft) by Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company.(Scroggins-Uptigrove, Kayla) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#11

(#11) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 4 February 2021. Consent Form due by 4/7/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 4/14/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 4/21/2021 10:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Elisabeth L. Owen on behalf of David D. WoodsAttorney Elisabeth L. Owen added to party David D. Woods(pty:pla) (Owen, Elisabeth) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jordan Suzanne Coley on behalf of David D. WoodsAttorney Jordan Suzanne Coley added to party David D. Woods(pty:pla) (Coley, Jordan) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

#8

(#8) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (alave, ) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

#6

(#6) STATE COURT ORDER GRANTING Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. By Eric Martin Johnson, Denver District Court Judge on 01/20/2021. (alave, ) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Civil Summons and Civil Complaint upon Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company on 12/30/2020. (alave, ) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

#4

(#4) COMPLAINT against Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company, filed by David D. Woods.(alave, ) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc., Corporate Parent Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company for Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company. (Stephenson, Evan) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

1 #9

State Court - Pre-Trial Order

1 #8

State Court - Order Re Discovery Protocol

1 #7

State Court - Delay Reduction Order

1 #6

State Court - Summons

1 #4

State Court - Order Granting Extension to 02-08-2021 to respond to Complaint

1 #3

State Court - Affidavit of Service

1 #1

Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company from Denver County District Court, Case Number 2020CV034347. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7694986), filed by Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #2 State Court - Complaint, #3 State Court - Affidavit of Service, #4 State Court - Order Granting Extension to 02-08-2021 to respond to Complaint, #5 State Court - District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #6 State Court - Summons, #7 State Court - Delay Reduction Order, #8 State Court - Order Re Discovery Protocol, #9 State Court - Pre-Trial Order, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stephenson, Evan) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2021
  • Docket(#16) MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/23/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec ) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • Docket(#15) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/23/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec ) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #13 . All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-305-RM. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Scroggins-Uptigrove, Kayla) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #4 Complaint Attorney Kayla L. Scroggins-Uptigrove added to party Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft) by Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company.(Scroggins-Uptigrove, Kayla) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 4 February 2021. Consent Form due by 4/7/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 4/14/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 4/21/2021 10:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Elisabeth L. Owen on behalf of David D. WoodsAttorney Elisabeth L. Owen added to party David D. Woods(pty:pla) (Owen, Elisabeth) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jordan Suzanne Coley on behalf of David D. WoodsAttorney Jordan Suzanne Coley added to party David D. Woods(pty:pla) (Coley, Jordan) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (alave, ) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • Docket(#7) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (alave, ) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STATE COURT ORDER GRANTING Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. By Eric Martin Johnson, Denver District Court Judge on 01/20/2021. (alave, ) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Civil Summons and Civil Complaint upon Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company on 12/30/2020. (alave, ) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT against Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company, filed by David D. Woods.(alave, ) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • Docket(#3) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (alave, ) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc., Corporate Parent Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company for Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company. (Stephenson, Evan) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company from Denver County District Court, Case Number 2020CV034347. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7694986), filed by Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #2 State Court - Complaint, #3 State Court - Affidavit of Service, #4 State Court - Order Granting Extension to 02-08-2021 to respond to Complaint, #5 State Court - District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #6 State Court - Summons, #7 State Court - Delay Reduction Order, #8 State Court - Order Re Discovery Protocol, #9 State Court - Pre-Trial Order, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stephenson, Evan) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less