This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/22/2022 at 12:11:08 (UTC).

Woods v. Hinkle et al

Case Summary

On July 15, 2022, Mina Woods (“Plaintiff”), represented by Kevin A. Easley Jr., of Higgins and Easley Law, P.C., and William Higgins of Carl and Higgins, filed a civil rights lawsuit against the Police Officer Robert Hinkle and Police Officer Nathan Ronan and the City of Lawton Oklahoma (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking punitive and compensatory damages for alleged assault, battery, and violation of civil rights which resulted in wrongful death. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma with Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti presiding. 

In the complaint, Plaintiff alleged that “on December 5, 2021, Plaintiff’s decedent Quadry Malik Sanders was shot and killed by Police Officers Robert Hinkle and Nathan Ronan outside his home. Mr. Sanders was unarmed, compliant, and posed no threat to the officers when he was shot. The Defendant officers’ use of lethal force was unreasonable and therefore violated Mr. Sanders’ rights under the Fourth Amendment of the United States Constitution.”

Plaintiff also alleged that “on December 5, 2021, at approximately 8:30 p.m., Lawton Police Department received 911 call alleging that Plaintiff’s decedent, Quadry Malik Sanders, was inside the residence at 1806 NW Lincoln Avenue, Lawton Oklahoma in violation of a protective Order. Lawton Police Officers Robert Hinkle and Nathan Ronan were dispatched to the address identified in the 911 call. Officer Hinkle, Officer Ronan, and other police personnel announced their presence by way of loudspeaker and requested that Mr. Sanders exit the house. Mr. Sanders briefly exited the side of the house, complied with the officers’ orders, then returned inside the house.”

Plaintiff further alleged that “despite this compliance, Officer Hinkle, and Officer Ronan repeatedly shot Mr. Sanders while screaming ‘HANDS!’ Sanders suffered multiple gunshot wounds and fell to the ground. Officer Hinkle, and Officer Ronan continued to discharge their firearms as the unarmed Mr. Sanders writhed in agony on the ground. Mr. Sanders repeatedly stated that he was down then gasped that he couldn’t breathe. Officer Hinkle grabbed Mr. Sanders by his feet and dragged him along the ground, leaving a trail of blood.”

Plaintiff then alleged that “Mr. Sanders was placed in handcuffs behind his back and placed in a prone position. As Mr. Sanders moaned and wailed in agony and blood poured from his gunshot wounds, Officer Hinkle yelled at him to ‘quit moving,’ and ‘quit reaching.’ Neither Officer Hinkle nor Officer Ronan attempted to render aid despite the obvious seriousness of his medical needs as evidenced by the trail of blood that was left when Mr. Sanders was dragged on the ground, his difficulty breathing, and the blood pooling beneath his body.”

Plaintiff additionally alleged that “as a direct and proximate result of Officer Hinkle and Officer Ronan’s conduct, actions, and inactions, Mr. Sanders’ civil rights were violated, which caused him to suffer catastrophic personal injury, pain and suffering, mental anguish, and death.”

Plaintiff presented five claims for relief alleging excessive force, deliberate indifference, assault, battery, and respondeat superior. 

In the prayer for relief, Plaintiff requested delay damages, costs of suit, general and specific damages, including both survival and wrongful death damages, and punitive and exemplary damages.

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00596

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy D. DeGiusti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mina Woods

Defendants

Robert Hinkle

Nathan Ronan

Lawton City of

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kevin A Easley, Jr

Attorney at Higgins and Easley Law, P.C.

417 W. First St.

Claremore, OK 74017

William Higgins

Attorney at Carle and Higgins

P.O. Box 1267

Claremore, OK 74018

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Receipt for Money Received from Mina Woods in the amount of $402.00, receipt number OKW500091269 regarding #1 Complaint (kmt) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Receipt for Money Received from Mina Woods in the amount of $402.00, receipt number OKW500091269 regarding #1 Complaint (kmt) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Robert Hinkle, Lawton City of, Nathan Ronan filed by Mina Woods. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less