This case was last updated from PACER on 06/04/2021 at 09:45:18 (UTC).

Woods Tree & Ag Services v. Corcoran Trucking

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 Woods Tree Ag Services filed an Other - Commerce lawsuit against Corcoran Trucking. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian Morris and John Johnston. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00034

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Commerce

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Brian Morris

John Johnston

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Woods Tree & Ag Services

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Corcoran Trucking

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Perry J. Schneider

Attorney at MILODRAGOVICH DALE STEINBRENNER

620 High Park Way, Po Box 4947

Missoula, MT 59806-4947

Michael David Bybee

Attorney at MILODRAGOVICH DALE STEINBRENNER

620 High Park Way, Po Box 4947

Missoula, MT 59806-4947

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Luc L. Brodhead

Attorney at GARLINGTON LOHN & ROBINSON, PLLP

350 Ryman Street, Po Box 7909

Missoula, MT 59807-7909

Nicholas J. Lofing

Attorney at GARLINGTON LOHN & ROBINSON, PLLP

350 Ryman Street, Po Box 7909

Missoula, MT 59807-7909

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) DISREGARD ENTRY. DOCKETED IN WRONG CASESCHEDULING ORDER: The following schedule shall govern this action: All amendments of pleadings and joinder of parties on or before: 8/2/2021. Discovery due by 4/15/2022. Motions due by 6/30/2022. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/15/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/22/2022 at 01:00 PM in Butte, MT before Magistrate Judge John Johnston. Jury Trial set for 10/4/2022 at 09:00 AM in Butte, MT before Magistrate Judge John Johnston. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 6/2/2021. **SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS** (ACC) Modified on 6/2/2021 (ACC). (Entered: 06/02/2021)

#14

(#14) SCHEDULING ORDER: The following schedule shall govern this action: All amendments of pleadings and joinder of parties on or before: 6/18/2021. Discovery shall close on: 11/19/2021. Motions due by 12/17/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/2/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/10/2022 at 01:00 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge John Johnston. Jury Trial set for 3/22/2022 at 09:00 AM in Great Falls, MT before Judge John Johnston. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 6/2/2021. **SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS** (ACC) Modified on 6/2/2021 to change presiding judge(ACC). (Entered: 06/02/2021)

#12

(#12) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Woods Tree & Ag Services. (Bybee, Michael) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

#11

(#11) STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Woods Tree & Ag Services. (Bybee, Michael) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

#10

(#10) JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Woods Tree & Ag Services. (Bybee, Michael) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

#9

(#9) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Corcoran Trucking. (Lofing, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

#8

(#8) Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant's ANSWER to #5 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Woods Tree & Ag Services. (Bybee, Michael) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

#7

(#7) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 5/26/2021. Joint Discovery Plan due by 5/26/2021. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 5/26/2021. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 6/2/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John Johnston. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 4/20/2021. (ACC) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#6

(#6) CONSENTS TO USMJ. (ACC) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#5

(#5) Corcoran Trucking, Inc.'s ANSWER to #4 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Woods Tree & Ag Services by Corcoran Trucking. (Lofing, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

4 #3

Exhibit C

4 #2

Exhibit B

4 #1

Exhibit A

#4

(#4) COMPLAINT (State Court) against All Defendants, filed by Woods Tree & Ag Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (SLR) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

3 #4

Issued Summons

3 #3

Affidavit of Service

#3

(#3) NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from Montana Eighth Judicial District Court, Cascade County, consisting of: (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Affidavit of Service, #4 Issued Summons) (SLR) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

1 #1

Attachments

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) DISREGARD ENTRY. DOCKETED IN WRONG CASESCHEDULING ORDER: The following schedule shall govern this action: All amendments of pleadings and joinder of parties on or before: 8/2/2021. Discovery due by 4/15/2022. Motions due by 6/30/2022. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/15/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/22/2022 at 01:00 PM in Butte, MT before Magistrate Judge John Johnston. Jury Trial set for 10/4/2022 at 09:00 AM in Butte, MT before Magistrate Judge John Johnston. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 6/2/2021. **SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS** (ACC) Modified on 6/2/2021 (ACC). (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SCHEDULING ORDER: The following schedule shall govern this action: All amendments of pleadings and joinder of parties on or before: 6/18/2021. Discovery shall close on: 11/19/2021. Motions due by 12/17/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/2/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/10/2022 at 01:00 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge John Johnston. Jury Trial set for 3/22/2022 at 09:00 AM in Great Falls, MT before Judge John Johnston. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 6/2/2021. **SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS** (ACC) Modified on 6/2/2021 to change presiding judge(ACC). (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John Johnston: Telephonic Pretrial Conference held on 6/2/2021. (SLL) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Woods Tree & Ag Services. (Bybee, Michael) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Woods Tree & Ag Services. (Bybee, Michael) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Woods Tree & Ag Services. (Bybee, Michael) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Corcoran Trucking. (Lofing, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant's ANSWER to #5 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Woods Tree & Ag Services. (Bybee, Michael) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 5/26/2021. Joint Discovery Plan due by 5/26/2021. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 5/26/2021. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 6/2/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John Johnston. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 4/20/2021. (ACC) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketClerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ. Pursuant to L.R. 73.1 and consent of the parties having been made, this case is assigned to the United States magistrate judge to conduct all further proceedings, enter judgment and conduct all post-trial proceedings. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge John Johnston. (ACC) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENTS TO USMJ. (ACC) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corcoran Trucking, Inc.'s ANSWER to #4 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Woods Tree & Ag Services by Corcoran Trucking. (Lofing, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketRemark: Original State Court documents placed in brown expando file on back shelf in Clerk's Office. (SLR) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT (State Court) against All Defendants, filed by Woods Tree & Ag Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (SLR) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from Montana Eighth Judicial District Court, Cascade County, consisting of: (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Affidavit of Service, #4 Issued Summons) (SLR) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Mailing of Consent: Honorable John T. Johnston as Presiding Judge. Electronically mailed to counsel Nicholas J. Lofing, Luc L. Brodhead, Perry J. Schneider, Michael David Bybee. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 4/22/2021. (SLR) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 402.00, receipt number 0977-2644798. (SLR) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Corcoran Trucking from Montana Eighth Judicial District Court, Cascade County, case number CDV-21-0097. (Attachments: #1 Attachments, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (SLR) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Perry J. Schneider(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael David Bybee