This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/05/2019 at 10:28:16 (UTC).

Woods-Nelson v. Chesapeake Operating L L C et al

Case Summary

On 04/26/2019 Woods-Nelson filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Chesapeake Operating L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark L Hornsby and S Maurice Hicks, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00533

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mark L Hornsby

Presiding Judge

S Maurice Hicks, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Saundra Louise Woods-Nelson

Defendants

Chesapeake Louisiana L P

Chesapeake Operating L L C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Harold Ryan Bicknell, III

Attorney at Davidson Summers

330 Marshall St Ste 1114

Shreveport, LA 71101

Randall Stephen Davidson

Attorney at Davidson Summers

330 Marshall St Ste 1114

Shreveport, LA 71101

Andrew David Martin

Attorney at Davidson Summers

330 Marshall St Ste 1114

Shreveport, LA 71101

Defendant Attorneys

David K McCrory

Attorney at Ottinger Hebert

P O Drawer 52606

Lafayette, LA 70505-2606

Patrick Stephen Ottinger

Attorney at Ottinger Hebert

P O Drawer 52606

Lafayette, LA 70505-2606

Benjamin David Jones

Attorney at Ottinger Hebert

P O Drawer 52606

Lafayette, LA 70505-2606

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 6/19/2019. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 8/12/2019. Plaintiff's witness List due by 10/31/2019. Defendants' witness lists due seven days thereafter. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 4/13/2020. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 5/29/2020. Discovery deadline 2/10/2020. Compel discovery 2/10/2020. Expert Depositions due by 7/17/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 10/17/2020. A follow-up telephone status conference will be held on February 4, 2020 at 10:00 am. Dial-in instructions will be emailed to all counsel of record. Trial counsel for each party must participate, and the use of cell phones is prohibited. (crt,Keller, J) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#6

(#6) RULE 26(f) Report by Saundra Louise Woods-Nelson, Chesapeake Louisiana L P and Chesapeake Operating L L C. (aty,Bicknell, Harold) Modified on 6/5/2019 to add filers (Dauterive, C). (Entered: 06/05/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/19/2019 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 6/5/2019. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 6/12/2019. Rule 26 Report due by 6/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 5/3/2019. (crt,Keller, J) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

#4

(#4) Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint by Chesapeake Louisiana L P, Chesapeake Operating L L C.(aty,McCrory, David) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chesapeake, Chesapeake Louisiana L P identifying Corporate Parent Chesapeake Energy Louisiana Corp for Chesapeake Louisiana L P; Corporate Parent Chesapeake Energy Corp for Chesapeake. (aty,McCrory, David) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

1 #7

Civil cover sheet

1 #6

State court return of service Chesapeake Operating, LLC

1 #5

State court return of service Chesapeake Louisiana, LP

1 #4

State court petition

1 #3

State court notice of filing

1 #2

Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

1 #1

Certificate of Counsel

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal of Civil Action from 42nd JDC DeSoto Parish, Case Number 80325 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3934520) filed by Chesapeake Louisiana L P, Chesapeake. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Counsel, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 State court notice of filing, #4 State court petition, #5 State court return of service Chesapeake Louisiana, LP, #6 State court return of service Chesapeake Operating, LLC, #7 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney David K McCrory added to party Chesapeake(pty:dft), Attorney David K McCrory added to party Chesapeake Louisiana L P(pty:dft))(aty,McCrory, David) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 6/19/2019. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 8/12/2019. Plaintiff's witness List due by 10/31/2019. Defendants' witness lists due seven days thereafter. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 4/13/2020. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 5/29/2020. Discovery deadline 2/10/2020. Compel discovery 2/10/2020. Expert Depositions due by 7/17/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 10/17/2020. A follow-up telephone status conference will be held on February 4, 2020 at 10:00 am. Dial-in instructions will be emailed to all counsel of record. Trial counsel for each party must participate, and the use of cell phones is prohibited. (crt,Keller, J) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • (#7) ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: The scheduling conference set for June 19, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. will now be conducted via telephone. Dial-in instructions will be emailed to all counsel of record. Trial counsel for each party must participate, and the use of cell phones is prohibited. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 6/13/2019. (crt,Stephens, M) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RULE 26(f) Report by Saundra Louise Woods-Nelson, Chesapeake Louisiana L P and Chesapeake Operating L L C. (aty,Bicknell, Harold) Modified on 6/5/2019 to add filers (Dauterive, C). (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/19/2019 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 6/5/2019. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 6/12/2019. Rule 26 Report due by 6/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 5/3/2019. (crt,Keller, J) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint by Chesapeake Louisiana L P, Chesapeake Operating L L C.(aty,McCrory, David) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 4/30/2019. (jud,Hornsby, Mark) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chesapeake, Chesapeake Louisiana L P identifying Corporate Parent Chesapeake Energy Louisiana Corp for Chesapeake Louisiana L P; Corporate Parent Chesapeake Energy Corp for Chesapeake. (aty,McCrory, David) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE of Removal of Civil Action from 42nd JDC DeSoto Parish, Case Number 80325 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3934520) filed by Chesapeake Louisiana L P, Chesapeake. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Counsel, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 State court notice of filing, #4 State court petition, #5 State court return of service Chesapeake Louisiana, LP, #6 State court return of service Chesapeake Operating, LLC, #7 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney David K McCrory added to party Chesapeake(pty:dft), Attorney David K McCrory added to party Chesapeake Louisiana L P(pty:dft))(aty,McCrory, David) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chesapeak Operating LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Randall Stephen Davidson