This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/05/2021 at 07:25:15 (UTC).

Woodnotch Farms Inc. v. Agri-Mark, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/06/2020 Woodnotch Farms Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Agri-Mark, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Vermont District. The Judge overseeing this case is William K. Sessions III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00180

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William K. Sessions III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Woodnotch Farms Inc.

Defendant

Agri-Mark, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James C. Foley, Jr., Esq.

Attorney at Lynch & Foley, P.C.

7 Washington Street

Middlebury, VT 05753

John M. Mazzuchi, Esq.

Attorney at Lynch & Foley, P.C.

7 Washington Street

Middlebury, VT 05753

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew B. Byrne, Esq.

Attorney at Gravel & Shea PC

76 St. Paul Street, 7Th Floor, P.O. Box 369

Burlington, VT 05402-0369

Jill M. O'Toole, Esq.

Attorney at Shipman & Goodwin LLP

One Constitution Plaza

Hartford, CT 06103-2819

John J. DiMarco, Esq.

Attorney at Shipman & Goodwin LLP

1875 K Street Nw, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) REPLY to Response to #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Agri-Mark, Inc.. (O'Toole, Jill) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

#16

(#16) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jill M. O'Toole, Esq on behalf of Agri-Mark, Inc..(O'Toole, Jill) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

15 #1

Certificate of Service

#15

(#15) RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Woodnotch Farms Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Foley, Jr., James) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

13 #3

Certificate of Service

13 #2

Exhibit 2

13 #1

Exhibit 1

#13

(#13) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John J. DiMarco and Jill M. O'Toole filed by Agri-Mark, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Certificate of Service)(law) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

12 #1

Exhibit A

#12

(#12) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Agri-Mark, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Byrne, Matthew) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

11 #1

Exhibit 1

#11

(#11) NOTICE by Agri-Mark, Inc. of Filing #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (originally filed 11/6/2020 in state court)(law) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

1 #7

Notice of Appearance

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) REPLY to Response to #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Agri-Mark, Inc.. (O'Toole, Jill) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jill M. O'Toole, Esq on behalf of Agri-Mark, Inc..(O'Toole, Jill) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Woodnotch Farms Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Foley, Jr., James) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Admission of John J. DiMarco and Jill M. O'Toole, Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 11/24/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John J. DiMarco and Jill M. O'Toole filed by Agri-Mark, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Certificate of Service)(law) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Agri-Mark, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Byrne, Matthew) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE by Agri-Mark, Inc. of Filing #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (originally filed 11/6/2020 in state court)(law) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION re #7 Complaint by Agri-Mark, Inc., Woodnotch Farms Inc. Answer of Agri-Mark, Inc. due by 11/16/2020. (originally filed 10/28/2020 in state court) (law) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Agri-Mark, Inc. served on 10/8/2020, answer due 10/29/2020. (originally filed 10/13/2020 in state court)(law) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Assigned Case Number. (originally filed 10/12/2020 in state court)(law) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) COMPLAINT against Agri-Mark, Inc. filed by Woodnotch Farms Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (originally filed 10/7/2020 in state court)(law) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RECEIVED FILE and certified copy of docket sheet from State Court. (law) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #4 Stipulated Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 11/10/2020. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STIPULATED MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Woodnotch Farms Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Foley, Jr., James) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) LETTER to Vermont Superior Court, Addison Unit, Civil Division seeking file upon removal. (law) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Agri-Mark, Inc. (law) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Agri-Mark, Inc. from Vermont Superior Court, Addison Unit, Civil Division, case number 20-cv-594. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Notice of Appearance, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(law) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Joseph DiMarco

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jill M. O'Toole

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew B. Byrne