This case was last updated from PACER on 06/25/2021 at 07:46:29 (UTC).

WOODMONT WEST MARKET, LLC v. EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/26/2021 WOODMONT WEST MARKET, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are N. C. TILLEY, JR and L. PATRICK AULD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00329

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

N. C. TILLEY, JR

Referral Judge

L. PATRICK AULD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WOODMONT WEST MARKET, LLC

Defendants

EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC

EXCHANGERIGHT NET-LEASED PORTFOLIO 46 DST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ANDREW H. R. BROWN

Attorney at BENSON, BROWN & FAUCHER, PLLC

822 N. Elm St., Ste. 200

Greensboro, NC 27401

BARRY D. HUNTER

Attorney at FROST BROWN TODD LLC

250 Wesy Main Street, Suite 2800

Lexington, KY 40507

Defendant Attorneys

KEARNS DAVIS

Attorney at BROOKS PIERCE MCLENDON HUMPHREY & LEONARD

Pob 26000

Greensboro, NC 27420-6000

D. J. O'BRIEN, III

Attorney at BROOKS PIERCE MCLENDON HUMPHREY & LEONARD

Pob 26000

Greensboro, NC 27420-6000

MICHAEL A. CAPLAN

Attorney at CAPLAN COBB LLP

75 Fourteenth Street, Ne, Suite 2750

Atlanta, GA 30309

CAMERON B. ROBERTS

Attorney at CAPLAN COBB LLP

75 Fourteenth Street, Ne, Suite 2750

Atlanta, GA 30309

JULIA B. STONE

Attorney at CAPLAN COBB LLP

75 Fourteenth Street, Ne, Suite 2750

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney BARRY D. HUNTER on behalf of Plaintiff WOODMONT WEST MARKET, LLC ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-3074999.) (HUNTER, BARRY) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

17 #2

Exhibit

17 #1

Exhibit

#17

(#17) BRIEF re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants EXCHANGERIGHT NET-LEASED PORTFOLIO 46 DST, EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC filed by EXCHANGERIGHT NET-LEASED PORTFOLIO 46 DST, EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(O'BRIEN, D.) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

#16

(#16) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by EXCHANGERIGHT NET-LEASED PORTFOLIO 46 DST, EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC. Response to Motion due by 7/1/2021 (O'BRIEN, D.) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney CAMERON B. ROBERTS on behalf of Defendants EXCHANGERIGHT NET-LEASED PORTFOLIO 46 DST, EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-3061473.) (ROBERTS, CAMERON) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney JULIA B. STONE on behalf of Defendants EXCHANGERIGHT NET-LEASED PORTFOLIO 46 DST, EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-3061463.) (STONE, JULIA) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney MICHAEL A. CAPLAN on behalf of Defendants EXCHANGERIGHT NET-LEASED PORTFOLIO 46 DST, EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-3061409.) (CAPLAN, MICHAEL) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

#12

(#12) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by EXCHANGERIGHT NET-LEASED PORTFOLIO 46 DST, EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'BRIEN, D.) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to EXCHANGERIGHT NET-LEASED PORTFOLIO 46 DST, EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC. (Original filed in Guilford County Superior Court, file number 21-CVS-4712, issued 4/20/2021, and listed as Exhibit 1 to the Petition for Removal) (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

#6

(#6) COMPLAINT against EXCHANGERIGHT NET-LEASED PORTFOLIO 46 DST, EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC, filed by WOODMONT WEST MARKET, LLC. (Original filed in Guilford County Superior Court, file number 21-CVS-4712, and listed as Exhibit 1 to the Petition for Removal) (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney KEARNS DAVIS on behalf of Defendants EXCHANGERIGHT NET-LEASED PORTFOLIO 46 DST, EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC (DAVIS, KEARNS) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney D. J. O'BRIEN, III on behalf of Defendants EXCHANGERIGHT NET-LEASED PORTFOLIO 46 DST, EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC (O'BRIEN, D.) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

#3

(#10) Corrected document re #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (O'BRIEN, D.) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by EXCHANGERIGHT NET-LEASED PORTFOLIO 46 DST, EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC. (O'BRIEN, D.) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0418-3036045.), filed by EXCHANGERIGHT NET-LEASED PORTFOLIO 46 DST, EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(O'BRIEN, D.) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney BARRY D. HUNTER on behalf of Plaintiff WOODMONT WEST MARKET, LLC ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-3074999.) (HUNTER, BARRY) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) BRIEF re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants EXCHANGERIGHT NET-LEASED PORTFOLIO 46 DST, EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC filed by EXCHANGERIGHT NET-LEASED PORTFOLIO 46 DST, EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(O'BRIEN, D.) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by EXCHANGERIGHT NET-LEASED PORTFOLIO 46 DST, EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC. Response to Motion due by 7/1/2021 (O'BRIEN, D.) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney CAMERON B. ROBERTS on behalf of Defendants EXCHANGERIGHT NET-LEASED PORTFOLIO 46 DST, EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-3061473.) (ROBERTS, CAMERON) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney JULIA B. STONE on behalf of Defendants EXCHANGERIGHT NET-LEASED PORTFOLIO 46 DST, EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-3061463.) (STONE, JULIA) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney MICHAEL A. CAPLAN on behalf of Defendants EXCHANGERIGHT NET-LEASED PORTFOLIO 46 DST, EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-3061409.) (CAPLAN, MICHAEL) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for EXCHANGERIGHT NET-LEASED PORTFOLIO 46 DST and EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC. Answer due by 6/10/2021. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 5/4/2021. (Brubaker, John) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by EXCHANGERIGHT NET-LEASED PORTFOLIO 46 DST, EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'BRIEN, D.) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Plaintiff WOODMONT WEST MARKET, LLC (BROWN, ANDREW) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corrected document re #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (O'BRIEN, D.) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketCase ASSIGNED to JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to EXCHANGERIGHT NET-LEASED PORTFOLIO 46 DST, EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC. (Original filed in Guilford County Superior Court, file number 21-CVS-4712, issued 4/20/2021, and listed as Exhibit 1 to the Petition for Removal) (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) COMPLAINT against EXCHANGERIGHT NET-LEASED PORTFOLIO 46 DST, EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC, filed by WOODMONT WEST MARKET, LLC. (Original filed in Guilford County Superior Court, file number 21-CVS-4712, and listed as Exhibit 1 to the Petition for Removal) (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney KEARNS DAVIS on behalf of Defendants EXCHANGERIGHT NET-LEASED PORTFOLIO 46 DST, EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC (DAVIS, KEARNS) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney D. J. O'BRIEN, III on behalf of Defendants EXCHANGERIGHT NET-LEASED PORTFOLIO 46 DST, EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC (O'BRIEN, D.) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by EXCHANGERIGHT NET-LEASED PORTFOLIO 46 DST, EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC. (O'BRIEN, D.) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by EXCHANGERIGHT NET-LEASED PORTFOLIO 46 DST, EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC. (O'BRIEN, D.) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0418-3036045.), filed by EXCHANGERIGHT NET-LEASED PORTFOLIO 46 DST, EXCHANGERIGHT REAL ESTATE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(O'BRIEN, D.) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDREW H. R. BROWN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Barry D. Hunter