This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/11/2020 at 07:45:16 (UTC).

Woodmen of the World Life Insurance Society v. Novak et al

Case Summary

On 11/12/2019 Woodmen of the World Life Insurance Society filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Novak. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gray H Miller. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-04449

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gray H Miller

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Woodmen of the World Life Insurance Society

1001 Fannin St., Ste. 1800

Houston, TX 77002

Defendants and Trustees

John Richard Symm

Loretta Clement Symm

Lorie Hughes Novak

Joan Gayle Kimber

Steven Carl Symm

James Clement Hughes

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chauntelle Renee Wood

Attorney at Attorney at Law

16100 Space Center Blvd, No 710

Houston, TX 77062

Defendant Attorney

Konor Andrew Cormier

Attorney at Mehaffy Weber

500 Dallas Street, Ste 1200

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ANSWER to Complaint by Lorie Hughes Novak(as Trustee of the Loretta Clement Symm Supplemental Needs Trust), Loretta Clement Symm, filed.(Cormier, Konor) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

#14

(#14) MOTION for Michael Sheppard Sands to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joan Gayle Kimber, John Richard Symm, Steven Carl Symm, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/17/2020. (hlerma, 4) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#13

(#13) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE by Woodmen of the World Life Insurance Society on November 25, 2019 re: Summons, filed.(Wood, Chauntelle) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#12

(#12) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE by Woodmen of the World Life Insurance Society on December 1, 2019 re: Summons, filed.(Wood, Chauntelle) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#11

(#11) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE by Woodmen of the World Life Insurance Society on November 23, 2019 re: Summons, filed.(Wood, Chauntelle) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#10

(#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE by Woodmen of the World Life Insurance Society on November 22, 2019 re: Summons, filed.(Wood, Chauntelle) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#9

(#9) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE by Woodmen of the World Life Insurance Society on November 30, 2019 re: Summons, filed.(Wood, Chauntelle) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#8

(#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE by Woodmen of the World Life Insurance Society on November 23, 2019 re: Summons, filed.(Wood, Chauntelle) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION re: Stipulation for Answer Date by Woodmen of the World Life Insurance Society, filed.(Wood, Chauntelle) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

6 #1

Proposed Order

#6

(#6) STIPULATION re: Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Lorie Hughes Novak(as Trustee of the Loretta Clement Symm Supplemental Needs Trust), filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cormier, Konor) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#5

(#5) First CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Woodmen of the World Life Insurance Society, filed.(Wood, Chauntelle) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to James Clement Hughes, Joan Gayle Kimber, Lorie Hughes Novak(in her individual capacity), Lorie Hughes Novak(as Trustee of the Loretta Clement Symm Supplemental Needs Trust), John Richard Symm, Loretta Clement Symm, Steven Carl Symm. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 2/28/2020 (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(MelissaMorganadi, 4) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#2

(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to James Clement Hughes, Joan Gayle Kimber, Lorie Hughes Novak, John Richard Symm, Loretta Clement Symm, Steven Carl Symm, filed.(Wood, Chauntelle) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT in Interpleader against Woodmen of the World Life Insurance Society (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23547120) filed by Woodmen of the World Life Insurance Society. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wood, Chauntelle) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ANSWER to Complaint by Lorie Hughes Novak(as Trustee of the Loretta Clement Symm Supplemental Needs Trust), Loretta Clement Symm, filed.(Cormier, Konor) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION for Michael Sheppard Sands to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joan Gayle Kimber, John Richard Symm, Steven Carl Symm, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/17/2020. (hlerma, 4) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE by Woodmen of the World Life Insurance Society on November 25, 2019 re: Summons, filed.(Wood, Chauntelle) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE by Woodmen of the World Life Insurance Society on December 1, 2019 re: Summons, filed.(Wood, Chauntelle) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE by Woodmen of the World Life Insurance Society on November 23, 2019 re: Summons, filed.(Wood, Chauntelle) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE by Woodmen of the World Life Insurance Society on November 22, 2019 re: Summons, filed.(Wood, Chauntelle) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE by Woodmen of the World Life Insurance Society on November 30, 2019 re: Summons, filed.(Wood, Chauntelle) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE by Woodmen of the World Life Insurance Society on November 23, 2019 re: Summons, filed.(Wood, Chauntelle) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STIPULATION re: Stipulation for Answer Date by Woodmen of the World Life Insurance Society, filed.(Wood, Chauntelle) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STIPULATION re: Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Lorie Hughes Novak(as Trustee of the Loretta Clement Symm Supplemental Needs Trust), filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cormier, Konor) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) First CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Woodmen of the World Life Insurance Society, filed.(Wood, Chauntelle) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to James Clement Hughes, Joan Gayle Kimber, Lorie Hughes Novak(in her individual capacity), Lorie Hughes Novak(as Trustee of the Loretta Clement Symm Supplemental Needs Trust), John Richard Symm, Loretta Clement Symm, Steven Carl Symm. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 2/28/2020 (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(MelissaMorganadi, 4) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to James Clement Hughes, Joan Gayle Kimber, Lorie Hughes Novak, John Richard Symm, Loretta Clement Symm, Steven Carl Symm, filed.(Wood, Chauntelle) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT in Interpleader against Woodmen of the World Life Insurance Society (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23547120) filed by Woodmen of the World Life Insurance Society. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wood, Chauntelle) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Woodmen of the World Life Insurance Society is a litigant