This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2021 at 09:37:22 (UTC).

Woodley et al v. Gilead Sciences, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/16/2021 Woodley filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Gilead Sciences, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephanie A. Gallagher. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01777

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephanie A. Gallagher

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Edwin R. Woodley

EDUARDO A. HAYNES

EDWIN WRIGHT

FRANK CRAWFORD

IVAN DRUMMOND

JEANNETTA JEFFERSON

MAXIE GRAHAM

RICHARD RICHARDSON

RODERICK HYNSON

RUFUS ANDREWS

STEPHANIE WESTMORELAND

SYLVIA P. GEE

TIMOTHY WARD

TYO WAITERS

Defendant

Gilead Sciences, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Peter Thomas Anderson

Attorney at Morgan and Morgan

4250 North Fairfax Drive, Ste. 600

Arlington, VA 22203

Robert Carl Hilliard

Attorney at Hilliard Martinez Gonzales LLP

719 S. Shoreline Blvd.

Corpus Christi, TX 78401

Defendant Attorney

Paul J Zidlicky

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

1501 K St Nw

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) ORDER granting #20 Joint Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 8/25/2021. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 8/25/2021 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 08/25/2021)

#22

(#22) NOTICE by RUFUS ANDREWS, FRANK CRAWFORD, IVAN DRUMMOND, SYLVIA P. GEE, MAXIE GRAHAM, EDUARDO A. HAYNES, RODERICK HYNSON, JEANNETTA JEFFERSON, RICHARD RICHARDSON, TYO WAITERS, TIMOTHY WARD, STEPHANIE WESTMORELAND, EDWIN WRIGHT, Edwin R. Woodley re #20 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California Proposed Order (Hilliard, Robert) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

20 #1

Exhibit A

#20

(#20) Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California by RUFUS ANDREWS, FRANK CRAWFORD, IVAN DRUMMOND, SYLVIA P. GEE, MAXIE GRAHAM, EDUARDO A. HAYNES, RODERICK HYNSON, JEANNETTA JEFFERSON, RICHARD RICHARDSON, TYO WAITERS, TIMOTHY WARD, STEPHANIE WESTMORELAND, EDWIN WRIGHT, Edwin R. Woodley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hilliard, Robert) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

#15

(#15) CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert C. Hilliard by RUFUS ANDREWS, FRANK CRAWFORD, IVAN DRUMMOND, SYLVIA P. GEE, MAXIE GRAHAM, EDUARDO A. HAYNES, RODERICK HYNSON, JEANNETTA JEFFERSON, RICHARD RICHARDSON, TYO WAITERS, TIMOTHY WARD, STEPHANIE WESTMORELAND, EDWIN WRIGHT, Edwin R. Woodley. The fee has already been paid.(Anderson, Peter) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

#14

No Description Available

#13

No Description Available

#8

No Description Available

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed. Gilead Sciences, Inc. served on 6/18/2021, answer due 7/18/2021. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued 30 days as to Gilead Sciences, Inc. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

#4

(#4) COMPLAINT against Gilead Sciences, Inc. filed by JEANNETTA JEFFERSON, STEPHANIE WESTMORELAND, EDWIN WRIGHT, MAXIE GRAHAM, RODERICK HYNSON, EDUARDO A. HAYNES, SYLVIA P. GEE, TYO WAITERS, RICHARD RICHARDSON, Edwin R. Woodley, FRANK CRAWFORD, TIMOTHY WARD, RUFUS ANDREWS, IVAN DRUMMOND. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul J Zidlicky on behalf of Gilead Sciences, Inc. (Zidlicky, Paul) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

#2

(#2) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Gilead Sciences, Inc. (Zidlicky, Paul) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from case number C-03-CV- 21-001806, filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Zidlicky, Paul) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketCase electronically transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER granting #20 Joint Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 8/25/2021. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 8/25/2021 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE by RUFUS ANDREWS, FRANK CRAWFORD, IVAN DRUMMOND, SYLVIA P. GEE, MAXIE GRAHAM, EDUARDO A. HAYNES, RODERICK HYNSON, JEANNETTA JEFFERSON, RICHARD RICHARDSON, TYO WAITERS, TIMOTHY WARD, STEPHANIE WESTMORELAND, EDWIN WRIGHT, Edwin R. Woodley re #20 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California Proposed Order (Hilliard, Robert) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) QC NOTICE: #20 Motion to Transfer Case, filed by RUFUS ANDREWS, JEANNETTA JEFFERSON, FRANK CRAWFORD, Edwin R. Woodley, RODERICK HYNSON, TIMOTHY WARD, IVAN DRUMMOND, STEPHANIE WESTMORELAND, TYO WAITERS, RICHARD RICHARDSON, MAXIE GRAHAM, EDUARDO A. HAYNES, EDWIN WRIGHT, SYLVIA P. GEE was filed incorrectly. Please file a proposed order using the event > Notice> Notice(Other)> and link to motion. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to the Northern District of California by RUFUS ANDREWS, FRANK CRAWFORD, IVAN DRUMMOND, SYLVIA P. GEE, MAXIE GRAHAM, EDUARDO A. HAYNES, RODERICK HYNSON, JEANNETTA JEFFERSON, RICHARD RICHARDSON, TYO WAITERS, TIMOTHY WARD, STEPHANIE WESTMORELAND, EDWIN WRIGHT, Edwin R. Woodley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hilliard, Robert) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #16 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Robert C Hilliard. Directing attorney Robert C Hilliard to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 8/20/2021. (dm4, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time. The time for Defendant to respond to the Complaint is hereby extended until September 22, 2021. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 8/20/2021. (vals, Chambers) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time FOR GILEAD SCIENCES, INC. TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Gilead Sciences, Inc.(Zidlicky, Paul) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert C. Hilliard by RUFUS ANDREWS, FRANK CRAWFORD, IVAN DRUMMOND, SYLVIA P. GEE, MAXIE GRAHAM, EDUARDO A. HAYNES, RODERICK HYNSON, JEANNETTA JEFFERSON, RICHARD RICHARDSON, TYO WAITERS, TIMOTHY WARD, STEPHANIE WESTMORELAND, EDWIN WRIGHT, Edwin R. Woodley. The fee has already been paid.(Anderson, Peter) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert C. Hilliard by RUFUS ANDREWS, FRANK CRAWFORD, IVAN DRUMMOND, SYLVIA P. GEE, MAXIE GRAHAM, EDUARDO A. HAYNES, RODERICK HYNSON, JEANNETTA JEFFERSON, RICHARD RICHARDSON, TYO WAITERS, TIMOTHY WARD, STEPHANIE WESTMORELAND, EDWIN WRIGHT, Edwin R. Woodley. The fee has already been paid.(Anderson, Peter) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketTHE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (4-6) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE COUNTY. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed. Gilead Sciences, Inc. served on 6/18/2021, answer due 7/18/2021. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued 30 days as to Gilead Sciences, Inc. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT against Gilead Sciences, Inc. filed by JEANNETTA JEFFERSON, STEPHANIE WESTMORELAND, EDWIN WRIGHT, MAXIE GRAHAM, RODERICK HYNSON, EDUARDO A. HAYNES, SYLVIA P. GEE, TYO WAITERS, RICHARD RICHARDSON, Edwin R. Woodley, FRANK CRAWFORD, TIMOTHY WARD, RUFUS ANDREWS, IVAN DRUMMOND. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCIVIL CASE FILING FEE: $ 402, receipt number 0416-9387217(Zidlicky, Paul) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketThe case of Woodley, et al v. Gilead Sciences, Inc., has been opened in the District of Maryland. The case number is SAG-21-1777. PLEASE NOTE: You must pay the case filing fee within 48 hours. To pay online, select the event Civil Case Filing Fee which is found under Civil Events --> Other Filings --> Other Documents. Otherwise, forward a check made payable to Clerk, U.S. District Court and note the assigned case number on the check or cover letter. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. (ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul J Zidlicky on behalf of Gilead Sciences, Inc. (Zidlicky, Paul) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Gilead Sciences, Inc. (Zidlicky, Paul) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from case number C-03-CV- 21-001806, filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Zidlicky, Paul) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gilead Sciences, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul John Zidlicky