This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/04/2020 at 08:37:19 (UTC).

Wooden; et al. vs. Comprehensive Health Management, Inc.; et al.

Case Summary

On 02/04/2020 Wooden filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Comprehensive Health Management, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District. The Judges overseeing this case are WES REBER PORTER and LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00053

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Hawaii District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

WES REBER PORTER

Presiding Judge

LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Brandy Reeves

Stephana Wooden

Defendants

Comprehensive Health Management, Inc.

WellCare Health Insurance of Arizona, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David F. Simons

Attorney at The Law Offices of David F. Simons

707 Richards St Ste Ph1, 536-3255

Honolulu, HI 96813

Rodney P. Bridgers, Jr.

Attorney at Law Offices of Rodney Bridgers, LLLC

707 Richards Street, Suite 526

Honolulu, HI 96813

Rodney Parry Bridgers, Jr.

Attorney at Law Offices of Rodney Bridgers, LLLC

707 Richards Street, Suite 526

Honolulu, HI 96813

 

Court Documents

5 #2

AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons

5 #1

AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons

#5

(#5) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, ) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

4 #1

Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements

#4

(#4) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 3/31/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 2/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, ) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Comprehensive Health Management, Inc., WellCare Health Insurance of Arizona, Inc. (emt, ) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ; Demand for Jury Trial; (Proposed) Summons against Brandy Wooden ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2328572.), filed by Brandy Wooden Stephana Wooden, Brandy Reeves .(Simons, David) Modified on 2/4/2020 Note: The complaint is signed by Rodney P. Bridgers, Jr., Esq. (emt, ). (Entered: 02/04/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2020
  • Docket(#8) EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for June 8, 2020 at 9:15 AM will be held by telephone. The Court will be using AT&T Connect Audio Conference at 1-888-278-0296 / Access Code: 8224751. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall notify Defendants. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • Docket(#7) EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 04/28/2020 is CONTINUED to 06/08/2020 at 09:15AM in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall notify Defendants of the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set by the Court. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • Docket(#6) EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 03/31/2020 is CONTINUED to 4/28/2020 at 09:45AM in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall notify Defendants of the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set by the Court. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, ) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 3/31/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 2/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, ) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Comprehensive Health Management, Inc., WellCare Health Insurance of Arizona, Inc. (emt, ) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY ENTRY. Incorrect Attorney Filer - Please be advised that Document #1 Complaint filed by Stephana Wooden and Brandy Reeves was signed by an attorney other than the one identified as the e-filer. The name of the CM/ECF User under whose login and password the document is being electronically filed must correspond to the signature of the attorney signing the CM/ECF filed document. No further action is necessary. (emt, ) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00053 LEK-WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, ) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ; Demand for Jury Trial; (Proposed) Summons against Brandy Wooden ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2328572.), filed by Brandy Wooden Stephana Wooden, Brandy Reeves .(Simons, David) Modified on 2/4/2020 Note: The complaint is signed by Rodney P. Bridgers, Jr., Esq. (emt, ). (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMPREHENSIVE HEALTH MANAGMENT INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David F. Simons(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rodney P. Bridgers, Jr.