This case was last updated from PACER on 08/31/2020 at 07:19:14 (UTC).

WOODELL v. BARRETT

Case Summary

On 07/02/2020 WOODELL filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against BARRETT. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are T KENT WETHERELL II and MICHAEL J FRANK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00182

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

T KENT WETHERELL II

Referral Judge

MICHAEL J FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KATHRYN WOODELL

Defendant

BARBARA SECRETARY US AIR FORCE BARRETT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARIE A MATTOX

Attorney at MARIE A MATTOX PA - TALLAHASSEE FL

203 North Gadsden Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by KATHRYN WOODELL. BARBARA SECRETARY US AIR FORCE BARRETT served on 7/8/2020, answer due 7/29/2020. (MATTOX, MARIE) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

3 #2

Summons Barr

3 #1

Summons Keef

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to BARBARA SECRETARY US AIR FORCE BARRETT. (Attachments: #1 Summons Keef, #2 Summons Barr) (alb) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (MATTOX, MARIE) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

1 #3

summons to be issued by Clerk

1 #2

Summons to be issued by Clerk

1 #1

Summons to be issued by clerk

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against BARBARA SECRETARY US AIR FORCE BARRETT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5438295.), filed by KATHRYN WOODELL. (Attachments: #1 Summons to be issued by clerk, #2 Summons to be issued by Clerk, #3 summons to be issued by Clerk) (MATTOX, MARIE) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by KATHRYN WOODELL. BARBARA SECRETARY US AIR FORCE BARRETT served on 7/8/2020, answer due 7/29/2020. (MATTOX, MARIE) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to BARBARA SECRETARY US AIR FORCE BARRETT. (Attachments: #1 Summons Keef, #2 Summons Barr) (alb) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (MATTOX, MARIE) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against BARBARA SECRETARY US AIR FORCE BARRETT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5438295.), filed by KATHRYN WOODELL. (Attachments: #1 Summons to be issued by clerk, #2 Summons to be issued by Clerk, #3 summons to be issued by Clerk) (MATTOX, MARIE) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less