This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2020 at 08:59:23 (UTC).

Woodards v. Amazon et al

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 Woodards filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Amazon. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Reed C. O'Connor and Hal R. Ray, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00736

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Reed C. O'Connor

Referral Judge

Hal R. Ray, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tre'von A. Woodards

Euless, TX 76039

Defendants

Amazon

AEP

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Findings and Recommendations on Motion re: #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Tre'von A. Woodards. Based on the relevant filings and applicable legal authorities, the Application should be DENIED, and the case should be dismissed for failure to follow court orders unless the Plaintiff timely pays the filing fee. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 8/27/2020) (skg) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER: It is therefore ORDERED that if Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this action, he must pay to the clerk of Court the full filing fee of $400.00 by August 20, 2020. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 7/21/2020) (skg) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

#4

(#4) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (npk) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set (see Special Order 3). Magistrate Judge Ray preliminarily assigned. (For court use only - links to the #national index and to the prior sanctions found within the #circuit index.) File to: No court file needed. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (npk) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Tre'von A. Woodards (npk) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against AEP, Amazon filed by Tre'von A. Woodards. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (npk) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2020
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Thu Aug 27 09:29:55 CDT 2020 (crt) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Findings and Recommendations on Motion re: #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Tre'von A. Woodards. Based on the relevant filings and applicable legal authorities, the Application should be DENIED, and the case should be dismissed for failure to follow court orders unless the Plaintiff timely pays the filing fee. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 8/27/2020) (skg) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Tue Jul 21 12:08:17 CDT 2020 (crt) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: It is therefore ORDERED that if Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this action, he must pay to the clerk of Court the full filing fee of $400.00 by August 20, 2020. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 7/21/2020) (skg) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3,4. Mon Jul 20 14:06:36 CDT 2020 (crt) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (npk) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set (see Special Order 3). Magistrate Judge Ray preliminarily assigned. (For court use only - links to the #national index and to the prior sanctions found within the #circuit index.) File to: No court file needed. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (npk) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Tre'von A. Woodards (npk) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against AEP, Amazon filed by Tre'von A. Woodards. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (npk) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less