This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:42:47 (UTC).

Woodard v. Jax Refrigeration, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Woodard filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Jax Refrigeration, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patricia D. Barksdale and Harvey E. Schlesinger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01403

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Patricia D. Barksdale

Presiding Judge

Harvey E. Schlesinger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Traci Woodard

Defendant

Jax Refrigeration, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kimberly De Arcangelis

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan, PA

20 N Orange Ave, Suite 1600

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant Attorneys

Todd Richard Dobry

Attorney at Jackson Lewis, PC

501 Riverside Ave Ste 902

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Richard N. Margulies

Attorney at Jackson Lewis, PC

501 Riverside Ave Ste 902

Jacksonville, FL 32202

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 (MGG) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#5

(#5) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Jax Refrigeration, Inc..(Margulies, Richard) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Jax Refrigeration, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16214532) filed by Traci Woodard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(De Arcangelis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Jax Refrigeration, Inc.. (KKH) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Richard Dobry on behalf of Jax Refrigeration, Inc. (Dobry, Todd) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Richard Dobry on behalf of Jax Refrigeration, Inc. (Dobry, Todd) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Jax Refrigeration, Inc..(Margulies, Richard) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 (MGG) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Jax Refrigeration, Inc.. (KKH) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:19-cv-1403-J-20PDB. (SJB) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Jax Refrigeration, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16214532) filed by Traci Woodard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(De Arcangelis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.