Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/12/2021 at 12:19:40 (UTC).

Woodard v. ABM Aviation, Incorporated

Case Summary

On 11/13/2020 Woodard filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against ABM Aviation, Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James C. Dever, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00602

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James C. Dever, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tyrone Woodard

Defendants

ABM AVIATION, INCORPORATED d/b/a ABM AIRPORT SERVICES

ABM Aviation, Incorporated d/b/a AMB Airport Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gary Martoccio

Attorney at Spielberger Law Group

4890 W. Kennedy Blvd., Suite 950

Tampa, FL 33609

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Tyrone Woodard. ABM Aviation, Incorporated waiver sent on 11/13/2020, answer due 1/12/2021. (Martoccio, Gary) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#4

(#4) Notice of Appearance filed by Gary Martoccio on behalf of Tyrone Woodard. (Martoccio, Gary) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#3

(#3) Financial Disclosure Statement by Tyrone Woodard (Martoccio, Gary) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Jacqueline E. Sacus on 11/13/2020 by Tyrone Woodard. Waiver of Service due by 12/14/2020. (Martoccio, Gary) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against ABM AVIATION, INCORPORATED d/b/a ABM AIRPORT SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5723783.), filed by Tyrone Woodard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Martoccio, Gary) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Tyrone Woodard. ABM Aviation, Incorporated waiver sent on 11/13/2020, answer due 1/12/2021. (Martoccio, Gary) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Appearance filed by Gary Martoccio on behalf of Tyrone Woodard. (Martoccio, Gary) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Financial Disclosure Statement by Tyrone Woodard (Martoccio, Gary) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Jacqueline E. Sacus on 11/13/2020 by Tyrone Woodard. Waiver of Service due by 12/14/2020. (Martoccio, Gary) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against ABM AVIATION, INCORPORATED d/b/a ABM AIRPORT SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5723783.), filed by Tyrone Woodard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Martoccio, Gary) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABM AVIATION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gary James Martoccio