This case was last updated from PACER on 09/10/2019 at 07:27:19 (UTC).

Woodard-CM, LLC v. Sunlord Leisure Products, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/12/2019 Woodard-CM, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Sunlord Leisure Products, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cecilia M. Altonaga and Jonathan Goodman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-22907

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cecilia M. Altonaga

Referral Judge

Jonathan Goodman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Woodard-CM, LLC

Defendant

Sunlord Leisure Products, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Oliver Alan Ruiz

Attorney at Malloy & Malloy, P.L.

2800 S.W. 3Rd Avenue

Miami, FL 33129

Meredith Frank Mendez

Attorney at Malloy & Malloy, P.A.

2800 S.W. Third Avenue

Miami, FL 33129

Peter Anthony Matos

Attorney at Malloy & Malloy

2800 Sw 3Rd Avenue

Miami, FL 33129

Defendant Attorneys

David H. Pollack

2600 Douglas Road, Suite 1007

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Zixuan Zhou

Attorney at Law Offices of Steve Qi & Associates

388 E. Valley Blvd., #200

Alhambra, CA 91801

 

Court Documents

#28

(#28) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Woodard-CM, LLC (Mendez, Meredith) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

#27

(#27) Administrative Order Closing Case. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

#26

(#26) NOTICE of Settlement by Woodard-CM, LLC (Mendez, Meredith) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

#25

(#25) ORDER denying #22 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Amended Complaint due by 9/4/2019. Status Report due by 9/11/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

22 #1

Affidavit

#22

(#22) Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint by Sunlord Leisure Products, Inc.. Responses due by 9/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Pollack, David) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

#21

(#21) ORDER STRIKING #17 Initial Disclosure(s) filed by Sunlord Leisure Products, Inc. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

#19

(#20) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

#17

(#21) ORDER STRIKING #17 Initial Disclosure(s) filed by Sunlord Leisure Products, Inc. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

(#7) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties due by 8/12/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (wc) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Woodard-CM, LLC. Sunlord Leisure Products, Inc. served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019. (Ruiz, Oliver) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

5 #1

Complaint

#5

(#5) FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (mee) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Sunlord Leisure Products, Inc.. (mee) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#22) Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint by Sunlord Leisure Products, Inc.. Responses due by 9/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Pollack, David) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Woodard-CM, LLC (Mendez, Meredith) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) terminated. per DE #27 (cbr) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) Administrative Order Closing Case. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) NOTICE of Settlement by Woodard-CM, LLC (Mendez, Meredith) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ORDER denying #22 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Amended Complaint due by 9/4/2019. Status Report due by 9/11/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga: Motion Hearing held on 8/28/2019 re #22 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint filed by Sunlord Leisure Products, Inc.. Total time in court: 16 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): David H. Pollack, Zixuan Zhou, Oliver Alan Ruiz, Meredith Frank Mendez, Court Reporter: Stephanie McCarn, 305-523-5518 / Stephanie_McCarn@flsd.uscourts.gov. (mh00) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) NOTICE telephonic status re: jurisdictional discovery, #22 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint: The parties may appear by phone and are instructed to call 1-888-684-8852 on the date and time set forth above. The access code is 3156459 and the password is 5510. FOR CLARITY, PLEASE DO NOT USE A CELL PHONE OR A SPEAKER PHONE. Telephonic Hearing set for 8/28/2019 01:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (ps1) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint by Sunlord Leisure Products, Inc.. Responses due by 9/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Pollack, David) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER STRIKING #17 Initial Disclosure(s) filed by Sunlord Leisure Products, Inc. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Corrected MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Sunlord Leisure Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pollack, David) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) PAPERLESS ORDER denying #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer due to the failure to submit a proposed order, as is required by the Local Rules. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Sunlord Leisure Products, Inc.. Attorney David H. Pollack added to party Sunlord Leisure Products, Inc.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pollack, David) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties due by 8/12/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (wc) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Woodard-CM, LLC. Sunlord Leisure Products, Inc. served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019. (Ruiz, Oliver) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (mee) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • (#4) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (mee) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Sunlord Leisure Products, Inc.. (mee) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mee) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Sunlord Leisure Products, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11809481, filed by Woodard-CM, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Ruiz, Oliver) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.