This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/29/2022 at 08:13:38 (UTC).

WOOD v. AMERIHEALTH CARITAS SERVICES, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/30/2021 WOOD filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against AMERIHEALTH CARITAS SERVICES, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN R. PADOVA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-05258

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN R. PADOVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANN WOOD

Defendant

AMERIHEALTH CARITAS SERVICES, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CAROLINE E. BRESSMAN

Attorney at NICHOLS KASTER PLLP

80 South Eighth St, 4600 Ids Center

Minneapolis, MN 55402

RACHHANA T. SREY

Attorney at NICHOLS KASTER PLLP

80 S. 8Th Street, Suite 4600

Minneapolis, MN 55402

PATRICIA A. BARASCH

Attorney at SCHALL & BARASCH

110 Marter Ave #302

Moorestown, NJ 08057

Defendant Attorneys

MICHAEL JONATHAN PUMA

Attorney at MORGAN LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

1701 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

ANTONIA MORAN

1701 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

VISHAL H. SHAH

Attorney at MORGAN LEWIS & BOCKIUS, LLP

1701 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

20 #1

Consent Form (2)

20 #20

Main Document

19 #2

Scheduling Information Report

19 #1

Notice

19 #19

Main Document

18 #1

Consent Form

18 #18

Main Document

17 #1

Certificate of Service

17 #17

Main Document

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL JONATHAN PUMA on behalf of AMERIHEALTH CARITAS SERVICES, LLC with Certificate of Service(PUMA, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

#6

(#6) APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rachhana Srey by ANN WOOD. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-15626050.). (BARASCH, PATRICIA) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

#5

(#5) APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Caroline Bressman by ANN WOOD. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-15626023.). (BARASCH, PATRICIA) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

#4

(#4) STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE PLEAD IN RESPONSE TO PLAITNIFF'S COMPLAINT UNTIL 01/14/2022. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 12/22/2021. 12/22/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd, ) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

#3

(#3) STIPULATION (Joint) And [PROPOSED] Order for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead in Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by AMERIHEALTH CARITAS SERVICES, LLC. (MORAN, ANTONIA) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Returned Executed by ANN WOOD served Summons and Complaint upon AMERIHEALTH CARITAS SERVICES, LLC. (BARASCH, PATRICIA) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

1 #2

Supplement

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE by ANN WOOD of Consent Filing (Attachments: #1 Consent Form (2))(SREY, RACHHANA) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE NOTICE. RE: PLEASE TAKE NOTE THAT A PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE WILL BE HELD ON 2/3/22 AT 2:00 PM BEFORE THE HON. JOHN R. PADOVA. THIS CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD BY TELEPHONE. (Attachments: #1 Notice, #2 Scheduling Information Report)(fdc) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE by ANN WOOD of Consent Filing (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(SREY, RACHHANA) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including BMH, LLC with Certificate of Service by AMERIHEALTH CARITAS SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MORAN, ANTONIA) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER to Complaint by AMERIHEALTH CARITAS SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MORAN, ANTONIA) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE by ANN WOOD of Consent Filing (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(SREY, RACHHANA) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE by ANN WOOD of Consent Filing (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(SREY, RACHHANA) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE by ANN WOOD of Consent Filing (Attachments: #1 Consent Form (7))(SREY, RACHHANA) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE by ANN WOOD of Consent Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Forms (2))(SREY, RACHHANA) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF RACHHANA T. SREY, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 12/23/21. 12/23/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by VISHAL H. SHAH on behalf of AMERIHEALTH CARITAS SERVICES, LLC with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SHAH, VISHAL) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by ANTONIA MORAN on behalf of AMERIHEALTH CARITAS SERVICES, LLC with Certificate of Service(MORAN, ANTONIA) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL JONATHAN PUMA on behalf of AMERIHEALTH CARITAS SERVICES, LLC with Certificate of Service(PUMA, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rachhana Srey by ANN WOOD. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-15626050.). (BARASCH, PATRICIA) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Caroline Bressman by ANN WOOD. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-15626023.). (BARASCH, PATRICIA) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE PLEAD IN RESPONSE TO PLAITNIFF'S COMPLAINT UNTIL 01/14/2022. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 12/22/2021. 12/22/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd, ) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STIPULATION (Joint) And [PROPOSED] Order for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead in Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by AMERIHEALTH CARITAS SERVICES, LLC. (MORAN, ANTONIA) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Returned Executed by ANN WOOD served Summons and Complaint upon AMERIHEALTH CARITAS SERVICES, LLC. (BARASCH, PATRICIA) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to AMERIHEALTH CARITAS SERVICES, LLC. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 12/1/21 (bw, ) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ANN WOOD ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15579518.), filed by ANN WOOD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement)(BARASCH, PATRICIA) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/1/2021) (sbt, ). (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/1/2021) (afm, ). (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/2/2021) (afm, ). (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERIHEALTH CARITAS SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Vishal H Shah

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael J. Puma