This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/15/2022 at 08:20:34 (UTC).

Wood v. Jaklevic, et al

Case Summary

On 11/16/2021 Wood filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Jaklevic. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Paul L. Maloney and Ray Kent. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00973

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul L. Maloney

Referral Judge

Ray Kent

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Keith Eric Wood

Mount Pleasant, MI 48858

Defendants

Peter Jaklevic

Big Rapids, MI 49307

Brian Thiede

Big Rapids, MI 49307

Janet Erlandson

Grand Rapids, MI 49525

Thomas Lyons

Big Rapids, MI 49307

Mecosta County Board of Commissioners

Mecosta County Building, 400 Elm Street

Big Rapids, MI 49307

Dana Nessel

Lansing, MI 48909

Mecosta, County of

Michigan, State of

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

David J. Gilbert

Attorney at Gilbert Law Office

306 E Broadway, Ste. 3

Mt. Pleasant, MI 48858

Defendant Attorneys

Haider A. Kazim

Attorney at Cummings, McClorey, Davis & Acho, PLC

310 W Front St., Ste. 221

Traverse City, MI 49684

Nathan A. Gambill

Attorney at MI Dept Attorney General (ENRA-Lansing)

525 W. Ottawa, 6Th Fl, P.O. Box 30755

Lansing, MI 48909

 

Court Documents

#1

(#3) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Gilbert, David) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee (slk) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#3

(#3) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Gilbert, David) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Janet Erlandson, Peter Jaklevic, Thomas Lyons, Mecosta, County of, Michigan, State of, Brian Thiede (ns) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#5

SUMMONS returned executed; Peter Jaklevic served on 12/8/2021, answer due 12/29/2021; Mecosta, County of served on 11/22/2021, answer due 12/13/2021; Michigan, State of served on 11/24/2021, answer due 12/15/2021; Brian Thiede served on 12/8/2021, answer due 12/29/2021 (pjw) as taken from #5 ; Modified text on 12/10/2021 (pjw) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#6

(#8) CORRECTED SUMMONS returned executed; Michigan, State of served on 12/20/2021, answer due 1/10/2022; this entry replaces #6 (Gilbert, David) Modified text on 12/29/2021 (pjw). (Entered: 12/27/2021)

#7

No Description Available

#8

(#8) CORRECTED SUMMONS returned executed; Michigan, State of served on 12/20/2021, answer due 1/10/2022; this entry replaces #6 (Gilbert, David) Modified text on 12/29/2021 (pjw). (Entered: 12/27/2021)

#9

(#9) MOTION to dismiss by defendants Janet Erlandson (Gambill, Nathan) Modified text on 12/29/2021 per filing attorney (eod) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

#10

(#10) BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss #9 filed by Janet Erlandson (Gambill, Nathan) Modified text on 12/29/2021 per filing attorney (eod) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

#11

(#11) CORRECTED SUMMONS returned executed; Janet Erlandson served on 12/13/2021, answer due 1/3/2022 (Gilbert, David) Modified on 12/29/2021; this entry replaces #6 (pjw). (Entered: 12/29/2021)

#12

(#12) MOTION to dismiss by defendant Michigan, State of; (Gambill, Nathan) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#13

(#13) BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss #12 filed by Michigan, State of (Gambill, Nathan) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#14

(#14) ORDER regarding #9 and #12 motions to dismiss; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#15

(#15) MOTION to dismiss ; Brief in Support, Certificate of Compliance,and Proof of Service by defendants Peter Jaklevic, Thomas Lyons, Mecosta, County of, Brian Thiede; (Kazim, Haider) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#16

(#16) CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss ; Brief in Support, Certificate of Compliance,and Proof of Service #15 filed by Peter Jaklevic, Thomas Lyons, Mecosta, County of, Brian Thiede (Kazim, Haider) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss ; Brief in Support, Certificate of Compliance,and Proof of Service #15 filed by Peter Jaklevic, Thomas Lyons, Mecosta, County of, Brian Thiede (Kazim, Haider) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to dismiss ; Brief in Support, Certificate of Compliance,and Proof of Service by defendants Peter Jaklevic, Thomas Lyons, Mecosta, County of, Brian Thiede; (Kazim, Haider) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER regarding #9 and #12 motions to dismiss; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss #12 filed by Michigan, State of (Gambill, Nathan) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to dismiss by defendant Michigan, State of; (Gambill, Nathan) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CORRECTED SUMMONS returned executed; Janet Erlandson served on 12/13/2021, answer due 1/3/2022 (Gilbert, David) Modified on 12/29/2021; this entry replaces #6 (pjw). (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss #9 filed by Janet Erlandson (Gambill, Nathan) Modified text on 12/29/2021 per filing attorney (eod) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to dismiss by defendants Janet Erlandson (Gambill, Nathan) Modified text on 12/29/2021 per filing attorney (eod) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Nathan A. Gambill on behalf of defendants Janet Erlandson, Michigan, State of (Gambill, Nathan) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORRECTED SUMMONS returned executed; Michigan, State of served on 12/20/2021, answer due 1/10/2022; this entry replaces #6 (Gilbert, David) Modified text on 12/29/2021 (pjw). (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS returned executed; Janet Erlandson served on 12/13/2021, answer due 1/3/2022 (Gilbert, David); this entry replaced by #8 and #11 ; Modified text on 12/28/2021 and 12/29/2021 (pjw) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Haider A. Kazim on behalf of defendants Peter Jaklevic, Thomas Lyons, Mecosta, County of, Brian Thiede (Kazim, Haider) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS returned executed; Peter Jaklevic served on 12/8/2021, answer due 12/29/2021; Mecosta, County of served on 11/22/2021, answer due 12/13/2021; Michigan, State of served on 11/24/2021, answer due 12/15/2021; Brian Thiede served on 12/8/2021, answer due 12/29/2021 (pjw) as taken from #5 ; Modified text on 12/10/2021 (pjw) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS returned executed; Thomas Lyons served on 12/8/2021, answer due 12/29/2021 (Gilbert, David) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Janet Erlandson, Peter Jaklevic, Thomas Lyons, Mecosta, County of, Michigan, State of, Brian Thiede (ns) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Gilbert, David) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants Janet Erlandson, Peter Jaklevic, Thomas Lyons, Mecosta, County of, Michigan, State of, Brian Thiede ; none provided. (ns) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILING FEE PAID re #1 by petitioner Keith Eric Wood in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6597604 (Gilbert, David) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee (slk) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Keith Eric Wood (Gilbert, David) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Haider A. Kazim

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathan A. Gambill