This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/07/2021 at 08:18:06 (UTC).

Wong v. Transport Workers Union, Local 100, AFL-CIO et al

Case Summary

On 03/08/2021 Wong filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Transport Workers Union, Local 100, AFL-CIO. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert M. Levy and William F. Kuntz, II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01221

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Robert M. Levy

Presiding Judge

William F. Kuntz, II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wayne Wong

Defendants

Robert E. Foran

Transport Workers Union, Local 100, AFL-CIO

Metropolitan Transportation Authority

Metropolitan Transportation AuthorityNew York City Transit

Tony Utano

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nathan J. McGrath

Attorney at The Fairness Center

500 North Third Street, Suite 600B

Harrisburg, PA 17101

Danielle Susanj

Attorney at The Fairness Center

500 North Third Street, Suite 600B

Harrisburg, PA 17101

Tyler K. Patterson

Attorney at The Fairness Center

500 North Third Street, Suite 600B

Harrisburg, PA 17101

Defendant Attorneys

Neil Abramson

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

Eleven Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Brian Isaac Confino

Attorney at Metropolitan Transportation Authority Hq

2 Broadway, Ste 4Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Alison Leigh MacGregor

Attorney at Metropolitan Transportation Authority

2 Broadway, 4Th Floor, New York

New York, NY 10004

Denis A. Engel

Attorney at Colleran, O'Hara & Mills LLP

100 Crossways Park Drive West, Suite 200

Woodbury, NY 11797

Patricia Lynne Boland

Attorney at Colleran, O'Hara & Mills L.L.P.

100 Crossways Park Drive W, Suite 200

Woodbury, NY 11797

 

Court Documents

#28

(#28) ORDER granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 5/6/2021. (Love, Alexis) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

#27

(#27) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Transport Workers Union, Local 100, AFL-CIO, Tony Utano. (Boland, Patricia) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

4 #4

Proposed Order

4 #3

Certificate of Good Standing DC

4 #2

Certificate of Good Standing Pennsylvania

4 #1

Affidavit

3 #3

Proposed Order

3 #2

Certificate of Good Standing Pennsylvania

3 #1

Affidavit

#3

ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 3/22/2021. (Marino, Janine) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE by Wayne Wong re #1 Complaint,, of Constitutional Challenge to a Statute (Patterson, Tyler) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

1 #6

Proposed Summons Tony Utano

1 #5

Proposed Summons Transit Workers Union, Local 100, AFL-CIO

1 #4

Proposed Summons Metropolitan Transportation Authority-NYC Transit

1 #3

Proposed Summons Metropolitan Transportation Authority

1 #2

Proposed Summons Robert E. Foran

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#25) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Robert E. Foran, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Metropolitan Transportation AuthorityNew York City Transit. (Abramson, Neil) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 5/6/2021. (Love, Alexis) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Transport Workers Union, Local 100, AFL-CIO, Tony Utano. (Boland, Patricia) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 4/29/2021. (Love, Alexis) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Robert E. Foran, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Metropolitan Transportation AuthorityNew York City Transit. (Abramson, Neil) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wayne Wong. Robert E. Foran served on 3/29/2021, answer due 4/19/2021; Metropolitan Transportation Authority served on 3/16/2021, answer due 5/5/2021; Metropolitan Transportation AuthorityNew York City Transit served on 3/23/2021, answer due 5/5/2021; Transport Workers Union, Local 100, AFL-CIO served on 3/26/2021, answer due 5/16/2021; Tony Utano served on 3/26/2021, answer due 5/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Executed Utano, #2 Summons Returned Executed MTA, #3 Summons Returned Executed Foran, #4 Summons Returned Executed NYCTA) (Susanj, Danielle) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Appearance by Neil Abramson on behalf of Robert E. Foran, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Metropolitan Transportation AuthorityNew York City Transit (aty to be noticed) (Abramson, Neil) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial conference by telephone has been scheduled for June 17, 2021 at 3:30 p.m., before the Honorable Robert M. Levy, United States Magistrate Judge at (888) 684-8852; Access Code #: 6223489. All counsel must be available. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to confirm with defendants' counsel that all necessary participants are aware of this conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 4/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 IC QUESTIONNAIRE, #2 INDIVIDUAL RULES) (Marino, Janine) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 4/14/2021. (Marino, Janine) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Lynne Boland on behalf of Transport Workers Union, Local 100, AFL-CIO, Tony Utano (aty to be noticed) (Boland, Patricia) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Transport Workers Union, Local 100, AFL-CIO, Tony Utano. (Engel, Denis) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 3/22/2021. (Marino, Janine) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 3/22/2021. (Marino, Janine) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Utano summons, #2 Foran summons, #3 MTA summons, #4 MTA NYCT summons) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-14257191. by Wayne Wong. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing Pennsylvania, #3 Certificate of Good Standing DC, #4 Proposed Order) (Susanj, Danielle) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-14257116. by Wayne Wong. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing Pennsylvania, #3 Proposed Order) (McGrath, Nathan) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by Wayne Wong re #1 Complaint,, of Constitutional Challenge to a Statute (Patterson, Tyler) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Robert E. Foran, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Metropolitan Transportation AuthorityNew York City Transit, Transport Workers Union, Local 100, AFL-CIO, Tony Utano filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14256717 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Wayne Wong. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Robert E. Foran, #3 Proposed Summons Metropolitan Transportation Authority, #4 Proposed Summons Metropolitan Transportation Authority-NYC Transit, #5 Proposed Summons Transit Workers Union, Local 100, AFL-CIO, #6 Proposed Summons Tony Utano) (Patterson, Tyler) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Transport Workers Union Local 100 is a litigant

Latest cases where Metropolitan Transportation Authority is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tyler K. Patterson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Danielle Susanj