This case was last updated from PACER on 08/31/2021 at 08:19:01 (UTC).

Wong et al v. Las Vegas Sands Corp. et al

Case Summary

On August 30, 2021, Judy Wong and William S. Wong (collectively, “Plaintiffs”), represented by William Sze Wong, filed a personal injury lawsuit against Las Vegas Sands Corp., Venetian Casino Resort, LLC, Las Vegas Sands, LLC and Ors. (collectively, “Defendants''). Plaintiffs filed suit seeking general and special damages along with attorney’s fees for the alleged negligent act of Defendants. This complaint was filed in the United States District Court in the Eastern District of California with Judges Kimberly J. Mueller and Kendall J. Newman presiding.

 

In the complaint the plaintiffs alleged that, “On or about September 2, 2019, Plaintiff, Judy Wong, was legally and lawfully upon Defendants’ premises, as a customer, business invitee, and patron when Plaintiff slipped on a polished wet marble floor on her way to the reception area to check-out after a night stay and fell on the wet polished marble floor’ with her full body weight on the back of her head causing substantial injuries. the fall suffered by Plaintiff and the injuries resulting therefrom were caused solely and proximately by the negligence of Defendants and without any negligence of Plaintiff contributing thereto.”

 

The plaintiffs further alleged that, “The Defendants reasonably should have had, actual knowledge and notice of said dangerous condition, and that the Defendants in the exercise of its duty of care should have had such knowledge and notice, yet failed to warn the Plaintiff of its existence of the danger, or fail to take reasonable action to protect the Plaintiff once they knew of the dangerous condition. As a result of the Defendants’ negligence Plaintiff suffered injuries. Said injuries caused Plaintiff to suffer extreme physical pain and suffering, and severe emotional distress, all to her damage in the amount in excess of $3,000,000.”

 

The plaintiffs also alleged that, “William S. Wong has suffered, and continues to suffer, the loss of consortium and companionship as a result of the injury to Plaintiff William S. Wong’s wife. The loss of consortium and companionship includes, but is not limited to, the physical, psychological, and emotional pain that results when the other spouse is injured and can no longer provide the love, affection, companionship, comfort, and sexual relations concomitant with normal married life, and the sadness, shock and anguish of seeing a spouse suffering from all kinds of physical and emotional injury as a direct and proximate result of Defendants’ negligence.”

 

There are two claims for relief laid down by the plaintiffs. The first claim deals with negligence as the Defendants due to Defendants’ duty to maintain its premises in a reasonably safe condition for the general public. The second claim deals with loss of consortium and companionship.

 

In the prayer for relief, Plaintiffs have requested the court for general damages, past and future, in a sum in excess of Three Million Dollars ($3,000,000.00). Plaintiffs also requested the court for special damages for medical care and treatment, and for future medical care and treatment and incidental expenses for a sum in excess of  Two Hundred Thousand Dollars ($200,000.00) for pain and suffering and for extreme emotional distress as a result of loss of consortium and companionship along with such other relief as the Court may deem just and equitable.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01553

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kimberly J. Mueller

Referral Judge

Kendall J. Newman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Judy Wong

William S. Wong

Meadow Vista, CA 95722

Defendants

Las Vegas Sands Corp.

Venetian Casino Resort, LLC

Las Vegas Sands, LLC a Nevada Limited Liability Company Doing business as Venetian Resort Hotel Casino

Palazzo Resort Hotel Casino

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William Sze Wong

Attorney at William Sze Wong Attorney at Law

P.O. Box 466

Meadow Vista, CA 95722

 

Court Documents

5 #3

VDRP

5 #2

Consent Form

5 #1

Standing Order

5 #5

Main Document

3 #1

Consent Form

3 #3

Main Document

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Las Vegas Sands Corp., Las Vegas Sands, LLC, Palazzo Resort Hotel Casino, Venetian Casino Resort, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Judy Wong and William S. Wong* *P.O. Box 466* *Meadow Vista, CA 95722*. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORRECTED CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/13/2022 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CLERK'S NOTICE of DOCKET CORRECTION: DISREGARD #3 Civil New Case Documents for KJM. Corrected documents to be issued. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE AT FRONT COUNTER: #2 Summons, #3 Civil New Case Documents for KJM served on Judy Wong, William S. Wong. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) [DISREGARD - SEE #5 ] CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/3/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Benson, A.) Modified on 8/30/2021 (Benson, A.). (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Las Vegas Sands Corp., Las Vegas Sands, LLC, Palazzo Resort Hotel Casino, Venetian Casino Resort, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Judy Wong and William S. Wong* *P.O. Box 466* *Meadow Vista, CA 95722*. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketRECEIPT number #CAE200116185 $402.00 fbo William Wong by William Wong on 8/30/2021. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Judy Wong, William S. Wong. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Benson, A.) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VENETIAN CASINO RESORT LLC A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where LAS VEGAS SANDS LLC is a litigant