This case was last updated from PACER on 10/24/2020 at 07:55:32 (UTC).

Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC v. MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.

Case Summary

On 08/25/2020 Wonderful Pistachios Almonds LLC filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is P. Kevin Castel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-06863

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

P. Kevin Castel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC

Zurich American Insurance Company

AGCS Marine Insurance Company

Zurich North America

Defendant

MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Louis Mazaroli

Attorney at Law Offices of David L. Mazaroli

250 Park Avenue - 7Th

New York, NY 10007

Defendant Attorneys

Mark A. Beckman

Attorney at Gordon & Rees , LLP

1 Battery Plaza,28Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

James Marissen

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

5 Park Plaza, Suite 1100

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. This case is not to be tried to a jury. Amended pleadings may not be filed and additional parties may not be joined except with leave of the Court. Any motion to amend or to join additional parties, shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this Order. Fact Discovery due by 2/19/2021. Deposition due by 1/15/2021. Expert Discovery due by 3/31/2021. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is: two days. Case Management Conference set for 3/5/2021 at 12:00 PM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/21/2020) (jwh) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

20 #4

Text of Proposed Order

20 #3

Exhibit B - Certificate of Standing - Supreme Court of CA and Certificate of Sta

20 #1

Affidavit Declaration of James A. Marissen in support of his Motion for Admissio

#20

(#20) MOTION for James A. Marissen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22202700. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of James A. Marissen in support of his Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Standing - Supreme Court of New York, #3 Exhibit B - Certificate of Standing - Supreme Court of CA and Certificate of Standing - CA State Bar, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Marissen, James) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

#18

(#18) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Company Ltd., Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Group Ltd., Corporate Parent Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc. for Zurich American Insurance Company. Document filed by Zurich American Insurance Company..(Mazaroli, David) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#17

(#17) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Co., Corporate Parent Allianz SE, Corporate Parent Allianz of America, Inc. for AGCS Marine Insurance Company. Document filed by AGCS Marine Insurance Company..(Mazaroli, David) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#16

(#16) AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #4 Complaint against MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A..Document filed by Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC, AGCS Marine Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company, Zurich North America. Related document: #4 Complaint..(Mazaroli, David) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#15

(#15) JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from David L. Mazaroli (on behalf of all counsel of record) dated October 14, 2020 re: Joint Letter of Counsel for Purposes of October 21, 2020 Pretrial Conference. Document filed by Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order).(Mazaroli, David) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#14

No Description Available

#13

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#5

***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney David Louis Mazaroli to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): caption error; do not abbreviate party name; party name must appear exactly as it does in pleading caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the corrected summons form PDF. (pne) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#4

(#16) AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #4 Complaint against MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A..Document filed by Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC, AGCS Marine Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company, Zurich North America. Related document: #4 Complaint..(Mazaroli, David) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#3

(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Wonderful Company LLC for Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC. Document filed by Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC..(Mazaroli, David) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge P. Kevin Castel: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/21/2020. The next case management conference is scheduled for March 5, 2021 at 12:00 p.m. (Nacanther, Florence) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. This case is not to be tried to a jury. Amended pleadings may not be filed and additional parties may not be joined except with leave of the Court. Any motion to amend or to join additional parties, shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this Order. Fact Discovery due by 2/19/2021. Deposition due by 1/15/2021. Expert Discovery due by 3/31/2021. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is: two days. Case Management Conference set for 3/5/2021 at 12:00 PM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/21/2020) (jwh) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER granting #20 Motion for James A. Marissen to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #20 MOTION for James A. Marissen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22202700. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION for James A. Marissen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22202700. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of James A. Marissen in support of his Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Standing - Supreme Court of New York, #3 Exhibit B - Certificate of Standing - Supreme Court of CA and Certificate of Standing - CA State Bar, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Marissen, James) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from David L. Mazaroli dated October 19, 2020 re: Call-in information for purposes of Initial Pretrial Conference on October 21, 2020 at 12:30 p.m.. Document filed by AGCS Marine Insurance Company, Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC, Zurich American Insurance Company, Zurich North America..(Mazaroli, David) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Company Ltd., Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Group Ltd., Corporate Parent Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc. for Zurich American Insurance Company. Document filed by Zurich American Insurance Company..(Mazaroli, David) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Co., Corporate Parent Allianz SE, Corporate Parent Allianz of America, Inc. for AGCS Marine Insurance Company. Document filed by AGCS Marine Insurance Company..(Mazaroli, David) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #4 Complaint against MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A..Document filed by Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC, AGCS Marine Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company, Zurich North America. Related document: #4 Complaint..(Mazaroli, David) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from David L. Mazaroli (on behalf of all counsel of record) dated October 14, 2020 re: Joint Letter of Counsel for Purposes of October 21, 2020 Pretrial Conference. Document filed by Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order).(Mazaroli, David) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC..(Mazaroli, David) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney David Louis Mazaroli to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): caption error; do not abbreviate party name; party name must appear exactly as it does in pleading caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the corrected summons form PDF. (pne) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC..(Mazaroli, David) Modified on 8/26/2020 (pne). (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT against MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.. Document filed by Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC..(Mazaroli, David) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Wonderful Company LLC for Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC. Document filed by Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC..(Mazaroli, David) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mazaroli, David) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR-COMPLAINT against Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21321366)Document filed by Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC..(Mazaroli, David) Modified on 8/26/2020 (pne). (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where AGCS Marine Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where WONDERFUL PISTACHIOS & ALMONDS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ZURICH NORTH AMERICA is a litigant