This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/12/2020 at 13:20:11 (UTC).

Womack v. Saul

Case Summary

On 04/13/2020 Womack filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary K. Dimke. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03047

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary K. Dimke

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brandi Lynn Womack

Defendants

Andrew Saul

Andrew M Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kevin S Kerr

Attorney at Schneider Kerr & Robichaux

626 Se Alder Street, Po Box 14490

Portland, OR 97293

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) CONSENT BY ALL PARTIES TO TRIAL AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH LEAVE TO RENEW. Before the Court is Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis. A review of the affidavit of indigency, however, reveals lack of information. Within (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall proffer the full filing fee, or submit a properly completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Case Management Deadline set for 5/15/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke. (VR, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2020
  • Docket(#8) ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status. IT IS SO ORDERED. TEXT ONLY entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order or notice on the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke. (ASV) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT BY ALL PARTIES TO TRIAL AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH LEAVE TO RENEW. Before the Court is Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis. A review of the affidavit of indigency, however, reveals lack of information. Within (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall proffer the full filing fee, or submit a properly completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Case Management Deadline set for 5/15/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke. (VR, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. (Attachments: #1 Summons - General Counsel, #2 Summons - US Attorney General)(VR, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Initial Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge and Consent or Non-Consent Form. Please Note: Consent Forms are not to be electronically filed with the Court. Return of Consent or Non-Consent is due by the Case Management Deadline set for 4/23/2020. (VR, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Judge Assignment. Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke assigned to case. (VR, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul IFP Pending Filed by Brandi Lynn Womack. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons OGC, #3 Summons USAG, #4 Summons USAO)(Kerr, Kevin) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin S Kerr