This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/17/2021 at 07:13:14 (UTC).

WOMACK v. DOLGENCORP, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/18/2021 WOMACK filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DOLGENCORP, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is GERALD A. MCHUGH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02267

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GERALD A. MCHUGH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JANNELLE WOMACK

Defendants

DOLGENCORP, LLC

DOLLAR GENERAL STORE #11242

DOLLAR GENERAL CORPORATION

DOLGENCORP, LLC INDIVIDUALLY doing business as DOLLAR GENERAL STORE #11242 also known as DOLLAR GENERAL STORE #11242 trading as DOLLAR GENERAL STORE #11242

DOLLAR GENERAL CORPORATION INDIVIDUALLY doing business as DOLLAR GENERAL STORE #11242 also known as DOLLAR GENERAL STORE #11242 trading as DOLLAR GENERAL STORE #11242

DOLLAR GENERAL STORE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PIERRE LATOUR, III

Attorney at SCARPELLO & LATOUR PC

121 S. Broad Street, Suite 1200

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Defendant Attorney

MATTHEW T. PISANO

Attorney at Pisano Law Firm

1628 John F Kennedy Bvld, Eight Penn Center Ste. 1002

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER THAT THIS ACTION IS REMANDED FORTHWITH TO THE PHILADELPHIA COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 6/22/21. 6/22/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, EMAILED TO PCCP.(JL ) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

13 #1

Exhibit

#13

(#13) Memorandum in Support of Remand to State Court by JANNELLE WOMACK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (LATOUR, PIERRE) Modified on 6/22/2021 (fb). (Entered: 06/21/2021)

#12

(#12) ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF IS TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF FEDERAL JURISDICTION NO LATER THAN 6/21/21 AND IN HER RESPONSE SET FORTH IN DETAIL ANY MEDICAL TREATMENT RECEIVED, ANY PROCEDURES PERFORMED, AND ANY SPECIAL DAMAGES RECOVERABLE IN THIS CASE; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 6/11/21. 6/11/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL ) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#11

(#11) Memorandum in Support of Federal Jurisdiction by DOLGENCORP, LLC, DOLLAR GENERAL CORPORATION, DOLLAR GENERAL STORE #11242. (PISANO, MATTHEW) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER THAT THIS COURT'S ORDER OF 6/1/21 IS VACATED. DEFENDANT IS GIVEN LEAVE TO SUBMIT A MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF FEDERAL JURISDICTION BY 6/11/21; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 6/3/21. 6/3/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, EMAILED TO PCCP.(JL ) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

#8

(#8) Letter dated June 1, 2021 by DOLGENCORP, LLC, DOLLAR GENERAL CORPORATION, DOLLAR GENERAL STORE #11242. (PISANO, MATTHEW) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER THAT THIS ACTION IS REMANDED FORTHWITH TO THE PHILADELPHIA COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 6/1/21. 6/1/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, EMAIL TO PCCP.(JL) (VACATED PER #9) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint and Separate Defenses by DOLGENCORP, LLC, DOLLAR GENERAL CORPORATION, DOLLAR GENERAL STORE #11242.(PISANO, MATTHEW) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

#5

(#5) STIPULATION of Plaintiff as to Amount in Controversey by JANNELLE WOMACK. (LATOUR, PIERRE) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

4 #1

ARBITRATION CERTIFICATION

#4

(#4) Letter re: Arbitration Certification dated 5/19/21 (Attachments: #1 ARBITRATION CERTIFICATION)(JL ) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

#3

(#3) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by DOLLAR GENERAL CORPORATION.(PISANO, MATTHEW) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including DOLLAR GENERAL CORPORATION by DOLGENCORP, LLC.(PISANO, MATTHEW) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

1 #4

Designation Form

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DOLLAR GENERAL STORE #11242, DOLLAR GENERAL CORPORATION, DOLGENCORP, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15131053), filed by DOLLAR GENERAL STORE #11242, DOLLAR GENERAL CORPORATION, DOLGENCORP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Designation Form)(PISANO, MATTHEW) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER THAT THIS ACTION IS REMANDED FORTHWITH TO THE PHILADELPHIA COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 6/22/21. 6/22/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, EMAILED TO PCCP.(JL ) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Memorandum in Support of Remand to State Court by JANNELLE WOMACK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (LATOUR, PIERRE) Modified on 6/22/2021 (fb). (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF IS TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF FEDERAL JURISDICTION NO LATER THAN 6/21/21 AND IN HER RESPONSE SET FORTH IN DETAIL ANY MEDICAL TREATMENT RECEIVED, ANY PROCEDURES PERFORMED, AND ANY SPECIAL DAMAGES RECOVERABLE IN THIS CASE; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 6/11/21. 6/11/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL ) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Memorandum in Support of Federal Jurisdiction by DOLGENCORP, LLC, DOLLAR GENERAL CORPORATION, DOLLAR GENERAL STORE #11242. (PISANO, MATTHEW) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • Docket(#10) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (JL ) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER THAT THIS COURT'S ORDER OF 6/1/21 IS VACATED. DEFENDANT IS GIVEN LEAVE TO SUBMIT A MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF FEDERAL JURISDICTION BY 6/11/21; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 6/3/21. 6/3/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, EMAILED TO PCCP.(JL ) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Letter dated June 1, 2021 by DOLGENCORP, LLC, DOLLAR GENERAL CORPORATION, DOLLAR GENERAL STORE #11242. (PISANO, MATTHEW) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER THAT THIS ACTION IS REMANDED FORTHWITH TO THE PHILADELPHIA COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 6/1/21. 6/1/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, EMAIL TO PCCP.(JL) (VACATED PER #9) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint and Separate Defenses by DOLGENCORP, LLC, DOLLAR GENERAL CORPORATION, DOLLAR GENERAL STORE #11242.(PISANO, MATTHEW) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION of Plaintiff as to Amount in Controversey by JANNELLE WOMACK. (LATOUR, PIERRE) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Letter re: Arbitration Certification dated 5/19/21 (Attachments: #1 ARBITRATION CERTIFICATION)(JL ) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketCase Eligible for Arbitration(fb) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by DOLLAR GENERAL CORPORATION.(PISANO, MATTHEW) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including DOLLAR GENERAL CORPORATION by DOLGENCORP, LLC.(PISANO, MATTHEW) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DOLLAR GENERAL STORE #11242, DOLLAR GENERAL CORPORATION, DOLGENCORP, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15131053), filed by DOLLAR GENERAL STORE #11242, DOLLAR GENERAL CORPORATION, DOLGENCORP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Designation Form)(PISANO, MATTHEW) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DOLGENCORP LLC 23373 is a litigant

Latest cases where DOLLAR GENERAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MATTHEW T. PISANO