This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/16/2022 at 11:51:10 (UTC).

Womack v. CVS Pharmacy, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/17/2022 Womack filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CVS Pharmacy, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Anthony W. Ishii and BakersfieldMJ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00739

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Anthony W. Ishii

Referral Judge

BakersfieldMJ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rita Womack

Defendants

CVS Pharmacy, Inc.

Garfield Beach CVS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gene Jeffrey Goldsman

Attorney at Law Office of Gene J. Goldsman

501 Civic Center Drive West

Santa Ana, CA 92701

Defendant Attorneys

Jason Scupine

Attorney at LaFollette, Johnson, DeHaas, Fesler & Ames

701 N. Brand Blvd., Ste 600

Glendale, CA 91203

Marissa A. Warren

Attorney at LaFollette Johnson DeHaas Fesler & Ames

2677 N. Main Street, Suite 901

Santa Ana, CA 92705

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Notice Notice of Interested Parties

1 #2

Declaration Declaration of Jason Scupine

1 #3

Declaration Declaration of Melanie St. Angelo

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Scupine, Jason) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF TEMPORARY MAGISTRATE JUDGE REFERRAL: Due to the elevation of Judge Jennifer L. Thurston to the position of U.S. District Judge, this action is temporarily referred to *Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe* until such time as a new Bakersfield magistrate judge is appointed. Documents filed in this case shall include the temporary magistrate judge initials *(BAM)* (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

BAK Worksheet

5 #2

Consent Form

5 #3

VDRP

#6

(#6) ANSWER by CVS Pharmacy, Inc..(Scupine, Jason) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Scupine, Jason) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Scupine, Jason) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER by CVS Pharmacy, Inc..(Scupine, Jason) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/14/2022 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 BAK Worksheet, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF TEMPORARY MAGISTRATE JUDGE REFERRAL: Due to the elevation of Judge Jennifer L. Thurston to the position of U.S. District Judge, this action is temporarily referred to *Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe* until such time as a new Bakersfield magistrate judge is appointed. Documents filed in this case shall include the temporary magistrate judge initials *(BAM)* (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT for Civil Case filing fee in the amount of $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10286640. (Scupine, Jason) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • Docket(#3) CLERK'S NOTICE to Attorney Jason Scupine. Advance payment of the filing fee in the amount of $402.00 is required and should be submitted electronically using the event Payment of Fees. Your case will not be filed until the fee is paid (Local Rule 121c). If you wish to pay with check or money order, the fee must be received by the clerk's office within 48 hours of lodging your complaint, or your documents will be deleted from the court's server. If you need assistance, please contact the CM/ECF help desk at 866-884-5444. (Maldonado, C) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Scupine, Jason) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Kern County Superior Court, case number BCV-22-101124 by Rita Womack. (Attachments: #1 Notice Notice of Interested Parties, #2 Declaration Declaration of Jason Scupine, #3 Declaration Declaration of Melanie St. Angelo)(Scupine, Jason) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CVS Pharmacy, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marissa Ann Warren