This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/17/2020 at 09:41:15 (UTC).

Wolfe v. Big Iron Auction Company

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 Wolfe filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Big Iron Auction Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Kimberly E. West. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00325

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kimberly E. West

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael E. Wolfe

Defendant

Big Iron Auction Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark Hammons

Attorney at Hammons Hurst & Associates

325 Dean A Mcgee Ave

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Brandon Douglas Roberts

Attorney at Hammons Hurst & Associates

325 Dean A Mcgee Ave

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Amber L. Hurst

Attorney at Hammons Hurst & Associates

325 Dean A Mcgee Ave

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Defendant Attorneys

Patrice D. Ott

Attorney at Koley Jessen, PC, LLO

1125 S 103Rd St, Ste 800

Omaha, NE 68124

J. Miles McFadden

Attorney at Titus Hillis Reynolds Love

15 E Fifth St, Ste 3700

Tulsa, OK 74103-4334

 

Court Documents

#18

#17

15 #1

Exhibit 1 - Application for Admission

#15

14 #1

Consent/Reassignment Form

#14

#13

11 #1

Exhibit A - 10/15/20 Order

#11

10 #1

Exhibit A - Summons

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#2

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Michael E. Wolfe (Hammons, Mark) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Patrice Ott on behalf of Big Iron Auction Company (Ott, Patrice) Modified on 11/6/2020 to edit event and text (dma, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West - Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by J. Miles McFadden on behalf of Patrice D. Ott (Docket Entry #15 ) is hereby GRANTED. Ms. Ott is admitted to practice in this District for the limited and sole purpose of representing Defendant in this action. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (adw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for Attorney Patrice D. Ott to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number AOKEDC-1421231) by Big Iron Auction Company (With attachments) Responses due by 11/16/2020(McFadden, J.) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 11/23/2020 at 9:30 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. The Court will initiate the conference call. Joint Status Report due by 11/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(adw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by Big Iron Auction Company (McFadden, J.) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West - Defendant's Stipulated Motion to Withdraw Its Motion to Dismiss (Docket Entry #11 ) is hereby GRANTED. Accordingly, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and accompanying brief (Docket Entry #9 and #10 ) are hereby deemed WITHDRAWN. Further, Defendant shall file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint no later than NOVEMBER 2, 2020.(adw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Stipulated MOTION to Withdraw Document (Re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss, #10 Brief in Support of Motion) by Big Iron Auction Company (With attachments) Responses due by 10/30/2020(McFadden, J.) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) BRIEF in Support of Motion (Re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss ) by Big Iron Auction Company ; (With attachments)(McFadden, J.) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Dismiss by Big Iron Auction Company [NOTE: Attorney J. Miles McFadden added to party Big Iron Auction Company(pty:dft)]. Responses due by 10/26/2020(McFadden, J.) Modified on 10/19/2020 to terminate/withdraw motion (adw, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brandon Douglas Roberts on behalf of Michael E. Wolfe (Roberts, Brandon) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Amber L. Hurst on behalf of Michael E. Wolfe (Hurst, Amber) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mark Hammons on behalf of Michael E. Wolfe (Hammons, Mark) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Big Iron Auction Company - Served on 9/21/2020. by Michael E. Wolfe (Hammons, Mark) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Big Iron Auction Company (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILING FEES Paid in Full on 9/18/2020 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1405403 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Michael E. Wolfe (Hammons, Mark) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 9/25/2020)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Big Iron Auction Company by Michael E. Wolfe (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Michael E. Wolfe (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jack Miles McFadden

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrice D. Ott