This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/23/2021 at 10:47:58 (UTC).

Wolfe et al v. Hawthorne Airport, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/24/2020 Wolfe filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Hawthorne Airport, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-10721

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Hawthorne Hangar Operations, L.P.

Dan Wolfe

Defendants

Hawthorne Airport, LLC

David Wehrly

Advanced Air, LLC.

City of Hawthorne

Levi Stockton

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Electronic Filing re Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening - optional html form, #1 , Terminate Attorney Civil Case Opening - optional html form,, #2 e-mailed to Ernest J Franceschi Jr at ejf@franceschillaw.com bounced due to typo in email address. Primary e-mail address corrected. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to ejf@franceschilaw.com. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) In response to the opening of this case, the Clerk issued a Notice to Filer of Deficiencies in Attorney Case Opening. The Notice indicated that unless counsel corrected the identified discrepancy within two business days, the docket for this case number would be closed and no further filings would be permitted under this case number. Counsel has not corrected the discrepancy. Accordingly, this case is now closed. No further filings may be made under this case number, except, if applicable, to request a refund of fees using a Form G-124, Application for Refund of Fees. Should you wish to pursue this action, a new case must be filed and a new case number issued. (Case Terminated.) (et) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: You have attempted to open this case electronically but have failed to upload successfully the required PDF version of any initiating document, such as a complaint or notice of removal. You must file an initiating document within two business days of this notice or the docket for this case number will be closed. [bcc:ejf@franceschillaw.com] (et) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Advanced Air, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases where HAWTHORNE HANGAR OPERATIONS L.P. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant