This case was last updated from PACER on 04/26/2021 at 07:15:11 (UTC).

WOLF v. TEMPLE UNIVERSITY

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 WOLF filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against TEMPLE UNIVERSITY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY BEETLESTONE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00866

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WENDY BEETLESTONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BETSY WOLF

Defendant

TEMPLE UNIVERSITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CAREN N. GURMANKIN

Attorney at CONSOLE MATTIACCI LAW LLC

1525 Locust St., 9Th Fl

Philadelphia, PA 19102

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BETSY WOLF. TEMPLE UNIVERSITY waiver sent on 3/1/2021, answer due 4/30/2021. (GURMANKIN, CAREN) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against TEMPLE UNIVERSITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14941324.), filed by BETSY WOLF.(GURMANKIN, CAREN) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BETSY WOLF. TEMPLE UNIVERSITY waiver sent on 3/1/2021, answer due 4/30/2021. (GURMANKIN, CAREN) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to TEMPLE UNIVERSITY. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 2/25/21 (bw, ) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by BETSY WOLF. (fb) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against TEMPLE UNIVERSITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14941324.), filed by BETSY WOLF.(GURMANKIN, CAREN) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL-EPISCOPAL CAMPUS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CAREN N. GURMANKIN