This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/15/2020 at 07:54:04 (UTC).

Wolf v. Idaho State Board of Correction, et al.

Case Summary

On 01/15/2020 Wolf filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Idaho State Board of Correction. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is B. Lynn Winmill. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00025

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

B. Lynn Winmill

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andrew J.J. Wolf

Boise, ID 83707

Defendants

Walter Campbell

Mark Way

Director IDOC Josh Tewalt

Mr. Teats

Amanda Gentry

Jeremy Hranac

Randy Valley

Ross Castleton

Randy Blades

J. Doe 1

Ashley Dowell

Mathel Castelton

Benjamin K Lee

Karen Niell

Corey Seely

Chad Page

David McClusky

Raul Mitchell, Jr

Dodds Hayden

14 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

12 #5

Proof of Exhaustion

12 #4

Proof of Exhaustion

12 #3

Proof of Exhaustion

12 #2

Proof of Exhaustion

12 #1

Proof of Exhaustion

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

3 #9

Envelope

3 #8

Cover Letter

#3

#1

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Randy Blades, Darryl Blanchard, Walter Campbell, Mathel Castelton, Ross Castleton, J. Doe 1, Ashley Dowell, John Fraser, Amanda Gentry, Nicholas Hale, Gary Hartgrove, Dodds Hayden, Amanda Hottinger, Jeremy Hranac, Idaho State Board of Correction, Benjamin K Lee, David McClusky, Raul Mitchell, Jr, Mr. Teats, Karen Niell, Chad Page, Leroy Penaku, Alberto Ramirez, Sabino J Ramirez, Timothy Richardson, Terrie Rosenthal, Corey Seely, Josh Tewalt, Randy Valley, Mark Way, Susan Wessles, Keith Yordy, Jeff Zmuda, filed by Andrew J.J. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Exhaustion, #2 Proof of Exhaustion, #3 Proof of Exhaustion, #4 Proof of Exhaustion, #5 Proof of Exhaustion)(kt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER FOR IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS AND WITHDRAWAL OF INMATE FILING FEE FROM PRISON TRUST ACCOUNT re #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Andrew J.J. Wolf (Notice sent to Finance). IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Dkt. #1 ) is GRANTED. The Director of the Idaho Department of Correction or a designee will collect from Plaintiff's prison trust account the $350.00 balance of the filing fee and will forward payments to the Clerk of Court. The Clerk of Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the Director of the Idaho Department of Correction. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice of Noncompliance with General Order 342 - Amended Complaint due by 3/11/2020. (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER re #6 Motion for Waiver of General Order No 342. IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion for Waiver of General Order No. 342 (Dkt. #6 ) is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to issue Plaintiff a notice of noncompliance with General Order 342. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REQUEST by Plaintiff Andrew J.J. Wolf for copy of docket sheet. (kt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion to Take Judicial Notice by Plaintiff Andrew J.J. Wolf. Responses due by 2/11/2020. (ckh) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Waiver of General Order No. 342 by Plaintiff Andrew J.J. Wolf. Responses due by 2/5/2020 (kt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION and Supporting Declaration for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Andrew J.J. Wolf. Responses due by 2/5/2020 (kt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER of Conditional Filing - (kt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) VERIFIED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Andrew J.J. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Complaint (p. 50-100), #2 Complaint (p. 101-149), #3 Complaint (p. 150-184), #4 Exhibit (p. 1-50), #5 Exhibit (p. 51-100), #6 Exhibit (p. 101-121), #7 Cover Sheet, #8 Cover Letter, #9 Envelope)(kt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Andrew J.J. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Account Summary)(kt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRISONER APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Andrew J.J. Wolf. Responses due by 2/5/2020 (kt)

    Read MoreRead Less