This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/04/2022 at 06:08:09 (UTC).

WOLF v 3M COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 08/03/2022 WOLF filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against 3M COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are M CASEY RODGERS and GARY R JONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-10870

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

M CASEY RODGERS

Referral Judge

GARY R JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEVEN WOLF

Defendants

3M COMPANY

3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC

AEARO HOLDING LLC

AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC

AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STACY KATHRYN HAUER

Attorney at JOHNSON BECKER PLLC - SAINT PAUL MN

444 Cedar Street, Suite 1800

Saint Paul, MN 55101

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17 ORDER GOVERNING ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT AND SHORT FORM COMPLAINT FOR FILED CASES. Any Plaintiff whose case becomes part of this MDL after the date of this Order, either by a direct filing and assignment to this Court (if permitted by subsequent order of the Court) or by transfer from another district or from another judge in this district, must file a Short Form Complaint within 20 days from the date of transfer or, if originally filed in this district, assignment to this Court. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2019. (Amended (Short Form) Complaint due by 8/23/2022.) (djb) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Summons and Complaint

1 #2

Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/3/2022.] (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/3/2022.] (Entered: 07/21/2022)

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

Exhibit A

#7

(#7) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-173) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers.(CLK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/3/2022.] (Entered: 08/02/2022)

8 #8

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

8 #1

*Restricted*

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17 ORDER GOVERNING ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT AND SHORT FORM COMPLAINT FOR FILED CASES. Any Plaintiff whose case becomes part of this MDL after the date of this Order, either by a direct filing and assignment to this Court (if permitted by subsequent order of the Court) or by transfer from another district or from another judge in this district, must file a Short Form Complaint within 20 days from the date of transfer or, if originally filed in this district, assignment to this Court. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2019. (Amended (Short Form) Complaint due by 8/23/2022.) (djb) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:22-cv-01856. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-173) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers.(CLK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/3/2022.] (Entered: 08/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Aearo Technologies, LLC and Certain of its Affiliates by Aearo Technologies, LLC, Aearo Holding, LLC, 3M Occupational Safety, LLC, 3M Company, Aearo Intermediate, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hulse, Benjamin) Modified text on 7/27/2022 (CLK). [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/3/2022.] (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Clerk's Notice to JPML regarding case potentially related to MDL #2885 re: #1 Notice of Removal. (ABR) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/3/2022.] (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • Docket(#4) (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per MDL list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 22-cv-1856 JRT/TNL.Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ABR) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/3/2022.] (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/3/2022.] (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/3/2022.] (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9649881) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/3/2022.] (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AEARO HOLDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where 3M COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC is a litigant