This case was last updated from PACER on 08/16/2020 at 10:13:16 (UTC).

W.L.P. Corporation v. Essential Services Group, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/17/2020 W L P Corporation filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Essential Services Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are James V. Selna and Autumn D. Spaeth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-01079

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James V. Selna

Referral Judge

Autumn D. Spaeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

W.L.P. Corporation

Defendants

James Thuney

Essential Services Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher Marlowe Von Maack

Attorney at McNeill VonMaack

175 South Main Street Suite 1050

Salt Lake City, CA 84111

Brian E Lahti

Attorney at McNeill Von Maack

175 South Main Street Suite 1050

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Defendant Attorney

Andrea Levenson

Attorney at Haynes and Boone LLP

600 Anton Boulevard Suite 700

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Joint STIPULATION to Continue Response to Complaint from July 27, 2020 to August 26, 2020 filed by Defendant James Thuney.(Attorney Andrea Levenson added to party James Thuney(pty:dft))(Levenson, Andrea) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

#11

(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff W.L.P. Corporation, upon Defendant Essential Services Group, Inc. served on 7/13/2020, answer due 8/3/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon James Roberts, National Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Von Maack, Christopher) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#10

(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff W.L.P. Corporation, upon Defendant James Thuney served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon James Thuney in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Von Maack, Christopher) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#9

(#9) Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 9/14/2020 at 10:00 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 9/7/2020. (lb) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

#8

(#8) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Essential Services Group, Inc., James Thuney. (lh) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (lh) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff W.L.P. Corporation. (Von Maack, Christopher) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff W.L.P. Corporation, (Von Maack, Christopher) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff W.L.P. Corporation. (Von Maack, Christopher) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit Amendment No. 3 to Convertible Promissory Note

1 #2

Exhibit Personal Guaranty

1 #1

Exhibit Secured Convertible Promissory Note

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26850668 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff W.L.P. Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Secured Convertible Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit Personal Guaranty, #3 Exhibit Amendment No. 3 to Convertible Promissory Note) (Attorney Christopher Marlowe Von Maack added to party W.L.P. Corporation(pty:pla))(Von Maack, Christopher) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Joint STIPULATION to Continue Response to Complaint from July 27, 2020 to August 26, 2020 filed by Defendant James Thuney.(Attorney Andrea Levenson added to party James Thuney(pty:dft))(Levenson, Andrea) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff W.L.P. Corporation, upon Defendant Essential Services Group, Inc. served on 7/13/2020, answer due 8/3/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon James Roberts, National Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Von Maack, Christopher) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff W.L.P. Corporation, upon Defendant James Thuney served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon James Thuney in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Von Maack, Christopher) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 9/14/2020 at 10:00 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 9/7/2020. (lb) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Essential Services Group, Inc., James Thuney. (lh) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (lh) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff W.L.P. Corporation. (Von Maack, Christopher) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff W.L.P. Corporation, (Von Maack, Christopher) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff W.L.P. Corporation. (Von Maack, Christopher) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26850668 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff W.L.P. Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Secured Convertible Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit Personal Guaranty, #3 Exhibit Amendment No. 3 to Convertible Promissory Note) (Attorney Christopher Marlowe Von Maack added to party W.L.P. Corporation(pty:pla))(Von Maack, Christopher) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less