This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/20/2021 at 08:20:31 (UTC).

Wittorf v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 06/21/2021 Wittorf filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Keith P Ellison. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-02023

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Keith P Ellison

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Erika Wittorf

Defendant

Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Madison Tate Donaldson

Attorney at Marc Whitehead Assoc.

430 Heights Boulevard

Houston, TX 77007

Defendant Attorneys

Eric Peter Mathisen

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins et al

56 S. Washington St.,, Suite 302

Valparaiso, IN 46383

Stephanie C Ng

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins et al

500 Dallas St, Suite 3000

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#12

11 #1

Proposed Order

#11

#10

#9

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Original Complaintt ; Answer due for Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company by 8/23/2021. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(gclair, 4) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Original Complaintt by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ng, Stephanie) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie C. Ng on behalf of Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, filed. (Ng, Stephanie) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company 8/16/2021. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Original Complaint by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mathisen, Eric) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, filed.(Mathisen, Eric) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric P. Mathisen on behalf of Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, filed. (Mathisen, Eric) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/17/2021 at 03:45 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(lgouadi, 4) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(DesireeSillas, 4) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Erika Wittorf, filed.(Donaldson, Madison) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, filed.(Donaldson, Madison) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26624463) filed by Erika Wittorf. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Donaldson, Madison) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Madison Tate Donaldson