This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:45:19 (UTC).

WITTES et al v. U.S. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 WITTES filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against U S FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Emmet G. Sullivan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01440

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Emmet G. Sullivan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SCOTT ANDERSON

BENJAMIN WITTES

SCOTT R. ANDERSON

Defendant

U.S. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Benjamin Leon Berwick

Attorney at PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.

10 Ware Street

Cambridge, MA 02138

Defendant Attorney

Scott Leeson Sroka

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

555 Fourth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION.(Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#6

(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/28/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/27/2019. (Berwick, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#5

(#5) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/28/19. (Berwick, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#4

(#4) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 5/30/2019 (Berwick, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

3 #1

Exhibit 1

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 05/29/19. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

2 #1

Notice and Consent

#2

(#2) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Summons FBI Summons

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #8

Summons Attorney General Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against U.S. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6131305) filed by BENJAMIN WITTES, SCOTT ANDERSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Summons FBI Summons, #8 Summons Attorney General Summons, #9 Summons U.S. Attorney Summons)(Berwick, Benjamin) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/20/2019) (zef, ). (Entered: 05/17/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER. In view of the #8 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file another joint status report by no later than August 29, 2019, updating the Court on the status of Defendant's review of the potentially responsive documents and proposing a joint recommendation for further proceedings. The parties shall file a proposed order with each joint status report. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 7/15/2019. (lcegs3) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Scheduling Order due by 7/12/2019. (mac) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs bring this action pursuant to the Freedom of Information Act (FOIA), 5 U.S.C. 552. The parties are directed to meet and confer and propose a joint scheduling order for further proceedings in this case by no later than July 12, 2019. The parties joint proposed scheduling order shall address the following: (1) The status of plaintiffs' FOIA request; (2) The anticipated number of documents responsive to plaintiffs' FOIA request; (3) The anticipated date(s) for release of documents responsive to plaintiffs' FOIA request; (4) Whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case; (5) Whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case; (6) Whether this case would benefit from referral to a Magistrate Judge or the District Court Mediation Program for purposes of settlement; and (7) A proposed briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if applicable. If the parties are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, the joint proposed scheduling order shall include each party's individual recommendations. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 6/28/2019. (lcegs3) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION.(Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/28/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/27/2019. (Berwick, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/28/19. (Berwick, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 5/30/2019 (Berwick, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 05/29/19. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zef, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against U.S. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6131305) filed by BENJAMIN WITTES, SCOTT ANDERSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Summons FBI Summons, #8 Summons Attorney General Summons, #9 Summons U.S. Attorney Summons)(Berwick, Benjamin) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/20/2019) (zef, ). (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less