This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:27:25 (UTC).

Wittenberg v. Marshall

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Wittenberg filed an Other lawsuit against Marshall. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Liam O'Grady and Theresa Carroll Buchanan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01539

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Liam O'Grady

Referral Judge

Theresa Carroll Buchanan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Arthur Wittenberg

Silver Spring, MD 20901

Defendant

Christopher Marshall

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Christopher Marshall by SPS. (acha, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Christopher Marshall ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 14683082271.), filed by Arthur Wittenberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Receipt)(acha, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

#3

(#3) ORDER- The Court finds this Complaint fails to meet federal pleading standard and has not asserted a substantial federal claim. Accordingly, the Complaint is DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 12/9/2019. (See order for further details). (acha, ) Copy sent as directed in the order. (Entered: 12/09/2019)

1 #9

Receipt

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER- The Court finds this Complaint fails to meet federal pleading standard and has not asserted a substantial federal claim. Accordingly, the Complaint is DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 12/9/2019. (See order for further details). (acha, ) Copy sent as directed in the order. (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Christopher Marshall by SPS. (acha, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Christopher Marshall ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 14683082271.), filed by Arthur Wittenberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Receipt)(acha, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.