This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/04/2022 at 08:42:27 (UTC).

Witte v. AT&T Services Inc et al

Case Summary

On 02/03/2022 Witte filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against AT T Services Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is David C Godbey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00274

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C Godbey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jill Witte

Defendants

AT&T Services Inc

DIRECTV LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William B Federman

Attorney at Federman & Sherwood

212 W Spring Valley Road

Richardson, TX 75081

John Charles Sherwood

Attorney at Law Office of John Charles Sherwood

212 W Spring Valley Road

Richardson, TX 75081

Gary S Graifman

Attorney at Kantrowitz Goldhamer & Graifman PC

747 Chestnut Ridge Road, Suite 200

Chestnut Ridge, NY 10977

Melissa R Emert

Attorney at Kantrowitz Goldhamer & Graifman PC

747 Chestnut Ridge Road, Suite 200

Chestnut Ridge, NY 10977

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against AT&T Services, Inc., DIRECTV, LLC filed by Jill Witte. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12575459) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) FAC Complete) (Federman, William) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

1 #1

Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit(s) FAC Complete

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William B Federman on behalf of Jill Witte. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Federman, William) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to AT&T Services Inc. Waiver sent on 2/4/2022. (Federman, William) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to DIRECTV LLC. Waiver sent on 2/4/2022. (Federman, William) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER: Case reassigned to Judge David C Godbey for all further proceedings. Judge Sam A. Lindsay no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 2/14/2022) (rekc) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

#7

(#7) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Melissa R. Emert (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12612004) filed by Jill Witte (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate Of Good Standing) (Federman, William) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

7 #1

Exhibit(s) Certificate Of Good Standing

#8

(#8) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Gary S. Graifman (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12612066) filed by Jill Witte (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate Of Good Standing) (Federman, William) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

8 #1

Exhibit(s) Certificate Of Good Standing

#9

(#9) ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES: Member case(s) 3:22-cv-274 consolidated with lead case 3:21-cv-1818. Member case administratively closed following consolidation. Further docketing should be in lead case 3:21-cv-1818. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/22/2022) (ygl) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

#12

(#12) ***DISREGARD, Duplicate Entry*** Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12645086) filed by Jill Witte (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) (Certificate of Good Standing), #2 Proposed Order For Pro Hac Vice Admission) (Graifman, Gary) Modified text on 3/4/2022 (ygl). (Entered: 03/04/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ***DISREGARD, Duplicate Entry*** Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12645086) filed by Jill Witte (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) (Certificate of Good Standing), #2 Proposed Order For Pro Hac Vice Admission) (Graifman, Gary) Modified text on 3/4/2022 (ygl). (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gary S. Graifman. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/25/2022) (chmb) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Melissa R. Emert. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/25/2022) (chmb) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES: Member case(s) 3:22-cv-274 consolidated with lead case 3:21-cv-1818. Member case administratively closed following consolidation. Further docketing should be in lead case 3:21-cv-1818. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/22/2022) (ygl) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Gary S. Graifman (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12612066) filed by Jill Witte (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate Of Good Standing) (Federman, William) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Melissa R. Emert (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12612004) filed by Jill Witte (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate Of Good Standing) (Federman, William) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: Case reassigned to Judge David C Godbey for all further proceedings. Judge Sam A. Lindsay no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 2/14/2022) (rekc) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to DIRECTV LLC. Waiver sent on 2/4/2022. (Federman, William) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to AT&T Services Inc. Waiver sent on 2/4/2022. (Federman, William) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William B Federman on behalf of Jill Witte. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Federman, William) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against AT&T Services, Inc., DIRECTV, LLC filed by Jill Witte. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12575459) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) FAC Complete) (Federman, William) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIRECTV LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AT&T Services Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Charles Sherwood

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gary Steven Graifman Esq.