This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/05/2022 at 08:45:06 (UTC).

Witt v. Saint Joseph Health System, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/06/2022 Witt filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Saint Joseph Health System, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Claria Horn Boom. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00102

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Claria Horn Boom

 

Party Details

Defendants

Saint Joseph Health System, Inc.

Commonspirit Health, Inc.

Ofc. Logan Medlock

City of London, Kentucky

Jailer Jamie Mosley

Sgt. R. Dalton Murray

Jacob Steele

LPN Felicia Pittman

Billy Howard

Brandon Phelps

Angie Buttrey

Alexey Bishop

Executor

Samara Witt

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Brandon Marshall Howell

Attorney at Thompson, Miller & Simpson, PLC - Louisville

734 W. Main Street, Suite 400

Louisville, KY 40202

Lon S. Hays

Attorney at Thompson, Miller & Simpson, PLC - Louisville

734 W. Main Street, Suite 400

Louisville, KY 40202

William Gary Crabtree

120 E. Fourth Street

London, KY 40741

Bridget L. Dunaway

Attorney at Tooms, Dunaway & Webster - London

1306 W. Fifth Street, Suite 200

London, KY 40743-0905

Casey Cavanaugh Stansbury

Attorney at Freeman Mathis & Gary LLP - KY

2525 Harrodsburg Road, Suite 500

Lexington, KY 40504

Curt Matthew Graham

Attorney at Freeman Mathis & Gary LLP - KY

2525 Harrodsburg Road, Suite 500

Lexington, KY 40504

Executor Attorney

Jonathan K. Kurtz

Attorney at Spencer Law Group

2224 Regency Road

Lexington, KY 40503

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint, by Angie Buttrey(Sued Individually), Angie Buttrey(Sued in Official Capacity), Billy Howard(Sued Individually), Billy Howard(Sued in Official Capacity), Jamie Mosley(Sued Individually ), Jamie Mosley(Sued in Official Capacity), Brandon Phelps(Sued in Official Capacity), Brandon Phelps(Sued Individually).(Graham, Curt) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#25

(#25) ORDER DENYING MOTION AS MOOT: 1. The Notice of Remand of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss [R. #23 ] is GRANTED. 2. Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss [R. #12 ] is DENIED, as moot. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 6/21/2022. (APR)cc: COR (Entered: 06/21/2022)

#24

(#24) ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint, by Commonspirit Health, Inc., Saint Joseph Health System, Inc..(Hays, Lon) (Entered: 06/20/2022)

#23

(#23) NOTICE to Remand (withdraw) by Commonspirit Health, Inc. re #12 MOTION to Dismiss by Commonspirit Health, Inc., Saint Joseph Health System, Inc. (Hays, Lon) Added text on 6/14/2022 (SYD). (Entered: 06/14/2022)

#21

(#21) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Commonspirit Health, Inc., Saint Joseph Health System, Inc..(Hays, Lon) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

#20

(#20) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Logan Medlock(Sued in Official Capacity). (Crabtree, William) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

1 #13

Summons Angie Buttrey

1 #12

Summons City of London, Kentucky

1 #11

Summons Commonspirit Health, Inc.

1 #10

Summons Billy Howard

1 #8

Summons Jamie Mosley

1 #6

Summons Brandon Phelps

1 #4

Summons Saint Joseph Health System, Inc.

1 #3

Summons Jacob Steele

1 #2

Receipt AKYEDC-5259776

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint, by Angie Buttrey(Sued Individually), Angie Buttrey(Sued in Official Capacity), Billy Howard(Sued Individually), Billy Howard(Sued in Official Capacity), Jamie Mosley(Sued Individually ), Jamie Mosley(Sued in Official Capacity), Brandon Phelps(Sued in Official Capacity), Brandon Phelps(Sued Individually).(Graham, Curt) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER DENYING MOTION AS MOOT: 1. The Notice of Remand of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss [R. #23 ] is GRANTED. 2. Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss [R. #12 ] is DENIED, as moot. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 6/21/2022. (APR)cc: COR (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint, by Commonspirit Health, Inc., Saint Joseph Health System, Inc..(Hays, Lon) (Entered: 06/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Claria H. Boom for review: #23 NOTICE to Remand (withdraw) by Commonspirit Health, Inc. re 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Commonspirit Health, Inc., Saint Joseph Health System, Inc. (SYD) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Claria H. Boom for review: re #12 MOTION to Dismiss by Commonspirit Health, Inc., Saint Joseph Health System, Inc. (SYD) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE to Remand (withdraw) by Commonspirit Health, Inc. re #12 MOTION to Dismiss by Commonspirit Health, Inc., Saint Joseph Health System, Inc. (Hays, Lon) Added text on 6/14/2022 (SYD). (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss by Commonspirit Health, Inc., Saint Joseph Health System, Inc. Response to Motion SJH Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by Samara Witt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A-Filed Amended Complaint)(Kurtz, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Commonspirit Health, Inc., Saint Joseph Health System, Inc..(Hays, Lon) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Logan Medlock(Sued in Official Capacity). (Crabtree, William) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Summons Issued (Amended Complaint) as to Alexey Bishop(Sued Individually ), Angie Buttrey(Sued Individually), Billy Howard(Sued Individually), Jamie Mosley(Sued Individually ), R. Dalton Murray(Sued Individually), Brandon Phelps(Sued in individually), Felicia Pittman(Sued in Individually), Jacob Steele(Sued Individually); Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (SYD) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Samara Witt as to Alexey Bishop(Sued Individually ). (Kurtz, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Samara Witt as to R. Dalton Murray(Sued Individually). (Kurtz, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Samara Witt as to Alexey Bishop(Sued in Official Capacity). (Kurtz, Jonathan) Modified name on 5/31/2022 (SYD). (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Proposed Agreed Order regarding extension of time to respond to Complaint by Angie Buttrey(Sued Individually), Angie Buttrey(Sued in Official Capacity), Billy Howard(Sued Individually), Billy Howard(Sued in Official Capacity), Jamie Mosley(Sued Individually ), Jamie Mosley(Sued in Official Capacity), Brandon Phelps(Sued in Official Capacity), Brandon Phelps(Sued Individually). (Graham, Curt) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Curt Matthew Graham on behalf of Angie Buttrey(Sued Individually), Angie Buttrey(Sued in Official Capacity), Billy Howard(Sued Individually), Billy Howard(Sued in Official Capacity), Jamie Mosley(Sued Individually ), Jamie Mosley(Sued in Official Capacity), Brandon Phelps(Sued in Official Capacity), Brandon Phelps(Sued Individually) (Graham, Curt) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to All Defendants ; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (Attachments: #1 Summons R. Dalton Murray, #2 Summons Officer Logan Medlock, #3 Summons Jailer Jamie Mosley, #4 Summons Jacob Steele, #5 Summons Felicia Pittman, LPN, #6 Summons Commonspirit Health Inc, #7 Summons City of London, KY, #8 Summons Brandon Phelps, #9 Summons Billy Howard, #10 Summons Angie Buttrey, #11 Summons Alexey Bishop)(JLC) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certification of Merit and Declaration of Plaintiff by Samara Witt. (JLC) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF FILING by Samara Witt re #1 Complaint,, (JLC) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketConflict Check run. (JLC) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $402; receipt number AKYEDC-5259776), filed by Samara Witt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt AKYEDC-5259776, #3 Summons Jacob Steele, #4 Summons Saint Joseph Health System, Inc., #5 Summons Felicia Pittman, LPN, #6 Summons Brandon Phelps, #7 Summons Sargent R. Dalton Murray, #8 Summons Jamie Mosley, #9 Summons Officer Logan Medlock, #10 Summons Billy Howard, #11 Summons Commonspirit Health, Inc., #12 Summons City of London, Kentucky, #13 Summons Angie Buttrey, #14 Summons Alexey Bishop)(JLC) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMMONSPIRIT HEALTH is a litigant

Latest cases where Saint Joseph Health System, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bridget L. Dunaway

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Curt Matthew Graham