This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/07/2021 at 09:19:14 (UTC).

WiTricity Corporation et al v. Momentum Dynamics Corporation

Case Summary

On 12/09/2020 WiTricity Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Momentum Dynamics Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mitchell S. Goldberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01671

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mitchell S. Goldberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Auckland UniServices Limited

WiTricity Corporation

Massachusetts Institute of Technology

Defendant

Momentum Dynamics Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephanie E. O'Byrne

Attorney at Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP

1313 N. Market St., Hercules Plaza, 6Th Flr., P.O. Box 951

Wilmington, DE 19899-0951

David Ellis Moore

Attorney at Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP

1313 N. Market St., Hercules Plaza, 6Th Flr., P.O. Box 951

Wilmington, DE 19899-0951

Carla Michelle Jones

Attorney at Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP

1313 N. Market St., Hercules Plaza, 6Th Flr., P.O. Box 951

Wilmington, DE 19899-0951

Jacob K. Baron

Taylor Han

Defendant Attorney

Jack B. Blumenfeld

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Jacob K. Baron, Taylor Han, and Brian P. Murray of Holland & Knight LLP as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer working on case. (O'Byrne, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SO ORDERED, re D.I. #12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daralyn J. Durie, Adam R. Brausa, Kaveri Vaid, Christina M. Randall of Durie Tangri LLP filed by Massachusetts Institute of Technology, WiTricity Corporation, Auckland UniServices Limited. Signed by Judge Mitchell S. Goldberg on 1/27/2021. (myr) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daralyn J. Durie, Adam R. Brausa, Kaveri Vaid, Christina M. Randall of Durie Tangri LLP - filed by Auckland UniServices Limited, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, WiTricity Corporation. (Moore, David) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Judge Mitchell S. Goldberg of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Please include the initials of the Judge (MSG) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Maximilian A. Grant, Matthew J. Moore and Jeffrey G. Homrig filed by Momentum Dynamics Corporation. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/11/2021. (fms) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Maximilian A. Grant, Matthew J. Moore and Jeffrey G. Homrig - filed by Momentum Dynamics Corporation. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brian P. Murray of Holland & Knight LLP filed by Massachusetts Institute of Technology, WiTricity Corporation, Auckland UniServices Limited. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/7/2021. (fms) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brian P. Murray of Holland & Knight LLP - filed by Auckland UniServices Limited, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, WiTricity Corporation. (O'Byrne, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for defendant to respond to the Complaint to February 16, 2021 filed by Momentum Dynamics Corporation, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Momentum Dynamics Corporation answer due 2/16/2021. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/28/2020. (nmf) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for defendant to respond to the Complaint to February 16, 2021 - filed by Momentum Dynamics Corporation. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jacob K. Baron and Taylor Han of Holland & Knight LLP - filed by Auckland UniServices Limited, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, WiTricity Corporation. (O'Byrne, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by WiTricity Corporation, Auckland UniServices Limited, Massachusetts Institute of Technology. Momentum Dynamics Corporation served on 12/9/2020, answer due 12/30/2020. (Moore, David) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNo Summons Issued. (mal) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent University of Auckland for Auckland UniServices Limited. Auckland UniServices Limited is a wholly-owned subsidiary of the University of Auckland. The University of Auckland is a body corporate established under the University of Auckland Act 1961 (NZ) and maintained under the Education and Training Act 2020 (NZ), of 22 Princes Street, Auckland, New Zealand, filed by Auckland UniServices Limited. (mal) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Massachusetts Institute of Technology. (mal) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent WiTricity Holdings, Inc. for WiTricity Corporation. WiTricity Corporation is a wholly owned subsidiary of WiTricity Holdings, Inc. The only entity that holds greater than a 10% interest in WiTricity Holdings, Inc. isMitsubishi Corporation of America. Mitsubishi Corporation of America is a subsidiary of Mitsubishi Corporation, which is traded on the Tokyo Stock Exchange, filed by WiTricity Corporation. (mal) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,741,734 B2 ;8,304,935 B2 ;8,710,701 B2 ;8,884,581 B2 ;9,184,595 B2 ;9,306,635 B2 ;9,767,955 B2. (mal) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Momentum Dynamics Corporation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3385857.) - filed by WiTricity Corporation, Auckland UniServices Limited, Massachusetts Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-15, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jack B. Blumenfeld