This case was last updated from PACER on 12/29/2020 at 07:58:44 (UTC).

John L. Withers, Jr. v. Transamerica Life Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 10/30/2020 John L Withers, Jr filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Transamerica Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John A. Kronstadt and Jean P. Rosenbluth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-10003

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Kronstadt

Referral Judge

Jean P. Rosenbluth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John L. Withers, Jr.

Defendants

Transamerica Corporation

Transamerica Life Insurance Company

Does 1 through 20, Inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Tiffany Noelle Buda

Attorney at Lexicon Law PC

633 West 5Th Street 28Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

John R Habashy

Attorney at Lexicon Law PC

633 West Fifth Street 28Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Alvin L Pittman

Attorney at Law Office of Alvin Pittman

5777 West Century Boulevard Suite 1685

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Defendant Attorneys

Vivian I Orlando

Attorney at Hinshaw and Culberson LLP

350 South Grand Avenue Suite 3600

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3476

Zina Yu

Attorney at Hinshaw and Culbertson LLP

350 South Grand Avenue Suite 3600

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3476

Misty A Murray

Attorney at Hinshaw and Culbertson LLP

350 South Grand Avenue Suite 3600

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3402

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Transamerica Corporation, Transamerica Life Insurance Company amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by plaintiff John L. Withers, Jr.(Pittman, Alvin) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#18

(#18) ORDER RE STIPULATION REGARDING PLAINTIFFS FILING OF A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (DKT. #17 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt, the Stipulation is APPROVED. Plaintiff shall have until December 21, 2020 to file his First Amended Complaint. Defendants shall have until January 11, 2021 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. (jp) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

17 #2

Proposed Order

17 #1

Declaration of Vivian I. Orlando in Support of the Parties' Stipulation

#17

(#17) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Filing of a First Amended Complaint by December 21, 2020, and for Defendants to File Their Response to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by January 11, 2021 filed by Defendants Transamerica Corporation, Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vivian I. Orlando in Support of the Parties' Stipulation, #2 Proposed Order)(Orlando, Vivian) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#16

(#16) ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/29/2021. (vv) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

15 #1

Certificate of Service

#15

(#15) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tiffany Noelle Buda counsel for Plaintiff John L. Withers, Jr.. Adding Tiffany N. Buda as counsel of record for John L. Withers for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff John L. Withers. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Tiffany Noelle Buda added to party John L. Withers, Jr.(pty:pla))(Buda, Tiffany) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#14

(#14) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John R Habashy counsel for Plaintiff John L. Withers, Jr.. Adding John R. Habashy as counsel of record for John L. Withers, Jr. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff John L. Withers. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney John R Habashy added to party John L. Withers, Jr.(pty:pla))(Habashy, John) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

#6

(#11) STATEMENT Declined Statement of Consent to Proceed Before United States Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff John L. Withers, Jr. re: Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form #6 . (Pittman, Alvin) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

5 #1

Exhibit A to Certificate of Service

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Transamerica Corporation, Transamerica Life Insurance Company, served on October 30, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Certificate of Service)(Orlando, Vivian) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Transamerica Corporation, Transamerica Life Insurance Company, (Orlando, Vivian) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Transamerica Corporation, Transamerica Life Insurance Company identifying Commonwealth General Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Orlando, Vivian) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Transamerica Corporation, Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Orlando, Vivian) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

1 #2

Declaration of Vivian I. Orlando in Support of Defendants' Notice of Remova

1 #1

Exhibit A-F to Notice of Removal

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20STCV36821 Receipt No: ACACDC-28788556 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Transamerica Corporation, Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F to Notice of Removal, #2 Declaration of Vivian I. Orlando in Support of Defendants' Notice of Removal) (Attorney Vivian I Orlando added to party Transamerica Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Vivian I Orlando added to party Transamerica Life Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Orlando, Vivian) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Transamerica Corporation, Transamerica Life Insurance Company amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by plaintiff John L. Withers, Jr.(Pittman, Alvin) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER RE STIPULATION REGARDING PLAINTIFFS FILING OF A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (DKT. #17 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt, the Stipulation is APPROVED. Plaintiff shall have until December 21, 2020 to file his First Amended Complaint. Defendants shall have until January 11, 2021 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. (jp) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Filing of a First Amended Complaint by December 21, 2020, and for Defendants to File Their Response to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by January 11, 2021 filed by Defendants Transamerica Corporation, Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vivian I. Orlando in Support of the Parties' Stipulation, #2 Proposed Order)(Orlando, Vivian) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/29/2021. (vv) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tiffany Noelle Buda counsel for Plaintiff John L. Withers, Jr.. Adding Tiffany N. Buda as counsel of record for John L. Withers for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff John L. Withers. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Tiffany Noelle Buda added to party John L. Withers, Jr.(pty:pla))(Buda, Tiffany) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John R Habashy counsel for Plaintiff John L. Withers, Jr.. Adding John R. Habashy as counsel of record for John L. Withers, Jr. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff John L. Withers. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney John R Habashy added to party John L. Withers, Jr.(pty:pla))(Habashy, John) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (vv) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:20-cv-10003 JAK (JPRx). (esa) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STATEMENT Declined Statement of Consent to Proceed Before United States Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff John L. Withers, Jr. re: Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form #6 . (Pittman, Alvin) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Defendants Transamerica Corporation, Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Orlando, Vivian) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (vm) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Transamerica Corporation answer now due 12/7/2020; Transamerica Life Insurance Company answer now due 12/7/2020, filed by Defendants Transamerica Corporation; Transamerica Life Insurance Company.(Orlando, Vivian) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Transamerica Corporation, Transamerica Life Insurance Company, served on November 4, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Certificate of Service)(Orlando, Vivian) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C Statement of Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge) (ghap) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 20, Inclusive, Transamerica Corporation, Transamerica Life Insurance Company. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff John L. Withers, Jr. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/25/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Transamerica Corporation, Transamerica Life Insurance Company, served on October 30, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Certificate of Service)(Orlando, Vivian) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Transamerica Corporation, Transamerica Life Insurance Company, (Orlando, Vivian) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Transamerica Corporation, Transamerica Life Insurance Company identifying Commonwealth General Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Orlando, Vivian) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Transamerica Corporation, Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Orlando, Vivian) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20STCV36821 Receipt No: ACACDC-28788556 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Transamerica Corporation, Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F to Notice of Removal, #2 Declaration of Vivian I. Orlando in Support of Defendants' Notice of Removal) (Attorney Vivian I Orlando added to party Transamerica Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Vivian I Orlando added to party Transamerica Life Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Orlando, Vivian) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRANSAMERICA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Transamerica Life Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zina Yu

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Vivian Orlando