This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:20:06 (UTC).

Wiskemann v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Wiskemann filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner, Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Walter E. Johnson and Harold L. Murphy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00287

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Walter E. Johnson

Presiding Judge

Harold L. Murphy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Wiskemann, II

Defendant

Commissioner, Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kathleen Marie Flynn

Attorney at Law Offices of Kathleen M. Flynn

Suite 940, 315 West Ponce De Leon Ave.

Decatur, GA 30030

Kenneth R Hiller

Attorney at Law Offices of Kenneth Hiller, PLLC

Suite 1A, 6000 N. Bailey Avenue

Amherst, NY 14226

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 12/9/19. (klb) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#5

RESTRICTED

4 #2

*Restricted*

4 #1

*Restricted*

4 #3

Complete Summons

#4

(#4) Electronic Summons Issued as to Commissioner, Social Security Administration. (Chief Counsel, AUSA, US Attorney General) (Attachments: #1 Summons (USA), #2 Summons (US Atty General))(klb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/9/2019: #3 Complete Summons) (jta). (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#6

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Kenneth Hiller. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 1/8/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jta) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Kenneth R. Hiller Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9219649). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Kenneth R Hiller added appearing on behalf of Michael Wiskemann, II (pmb) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPLICATION for Admission of Kenneth R. Hiller Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9219649). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Michael Wiskemann, II. (Flynn, Kathleen) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Electronic Summons Issued as to Commissioner, Social Security Administration. (Chief Counsel, AUSA, US Attorney General) (Attachments: #1 Summons (USA), #2 Summons (US Atty General))(klb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/9/2019: #3 Complete Summons) (jta). (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT filed by Michael Wiskemann, II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(klb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 12/9/19. (klb) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (dob) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Judge Harold L. Murphy. (dob) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Wiskemann, II. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(dob) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.