This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/19/2021 at 07:26:07 (UTC).

WISER et al v. ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/20/2021 WISER filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is PETRESE B. TUCKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01830

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PETRESE B. TUCKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MARC WISER

STELLA FISHER WISER

Defendant

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BRAD S. TABAKIN

Attorney at TABAKINWOLFE, LLP

1000 Germantown Pike, B-3

Plymouth Meeting, PA 19462

RICHARD A. WOLFE

Attorney at TabakinWolfe, LLP

1000 Germantown Pike, B-3

Plymouth, PA 19462

Defendant Attorneys

BRIAN H. CALLAWAY

Attorney at TROUTMAN PEPPER HAMILTON SANDERS LLP

3000 Two Logan Square, 18Th & Arch Streets

Philadelphia, PA 19103

SARA BETH RICHMAN

Attorney at TROUTMAN PEPPER HAMILTON SANDERS LLP

3000 Two Logan Square, Eighteenth And Arch Streets

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet

1 #2

Designation Form Designation Form

1 #3

Case Management Track Form Case Management Track Designation Form

1 #4

Exhibit Ex. A

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

7 #1

CONSENT FORM

#8

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice Re: Arbitration Consent of Videoconference(TABAKIN, BRAD) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice Re: Arbitration Videoconference (Attachments: #1 CONSENT FORM)(cjh, ) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Allstate Insurance Holdings, The Allstate Corporation by ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.(RICHMAN, SARA) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses by ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.(RICHMAN, SARA) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN H. CALLAWAY on behalf of ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(CALLAWAY, BRIAN) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by SARA BETH RICHMAN on behalf of ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(RICHMAN, SARA) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDERED THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HONORABLE LYNNE A. SITARSKI. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 4/30/21. 4/30/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, ) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. Forwarded To: Brad S. Tabakin on 4/20/21 (fdc, ) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15066053.), filed by MARC WISER, STELLA FISHER WISER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet, #2 Designation Form Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form Case Management Track Designation Form, #4 Exhibit Ex. A)(TABAKIN, BRAD) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SARA BETH RICHMAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRIAN H. CALLAWAY