This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/28/2021 at 08:41:34 (UTC).

Wisener v. Revlon Consumer Products Corp

Case Summary

On 10/29/2021 Wisener filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Revlon Consumer Products Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jane J. Boyle and Brantley Starr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-02683

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Jane J. Boyle

Brantley Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Naomi Wisener

Defendants

Arkema Inc (sued individually and as successor-by-merger to Wallance & Tiernan d/b/a WTS Pharmacraft) for its Desenex line of products formerly known as Pennwalt Corporation formerly known as Elf Atochem North America Inc

Bayer Consumer Care Holdings LLC

Revlon Consumer Products Corp

Elizabeth Arden, Inc

Amway Corp

Pennwalt Corporation

Elf Atochem North America Inc

Aventis Inc

Avon Products Inc

Barretts Minerals Inc

Bayer Consumer Care LLC

MSD Consumer Care Inc

Bayer Healthcare LLC

Block Drug Company Inc

Block Drug Corporation

Brenntag North America Inc

Brenntag Specialties LLC

GSK Consumer Health Inc

Himmel Management Co LLC (sued Individually and as successor-in-interest to Block Drug Corparation, successor-in-interest to The Gold Bond Sterilizing Powder Company a/k/a The Gold Bond Company) also known as Himmel Group doing business as Martin Him

35 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Holly C Peterson

1201 Elm Street, Suite 3400

Dallas, TX 75270

Carl William Margrabe

Attorney at Maune Raichle Hartley French & Mudd LLC

150 W 30Th Street, Suite 201

New York, NY 10001

Frank J Wathen

Attorney at Simon Greenstone Panatier PC

1201 Elm Street, Suite 3400

Dallas, TX 75270

Holly Christine Peterson

Attorney at Simon Greenstone Panatier PC

1201 Elm Street, Suite 3400

Dallas, TX 75270

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Hendryx

Attorney at Strong Pipkin Bissell & Ledyard

Two Riverway, Suite 1020

Houston, TX 77056

Clayton E Devin

Attorney at Macdonald Devin

3800 Renaissance Tower, 1201 Elm St

Dallas, TX 75270-2130

Gary Joe Ellis

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP

600 Travis St, Suite 2350

Houston, TX 77002

Chad A Johnson

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP

1900 N Pearl Street, Suite 1800

Dallas, TX 75201-6929

Kimberly Erin Solomon

Attorney at Hawkins Parnell & Young LLP

2705 Bee Caves Road, Suite 220

Austin, TX 78746

Laura E Kugler

Attorney at Hawkins Parnell & Young

4514 Cole Avenue, Suite 1225

Dallas, TX 75205

Edward Donald Burbach

Attorney at Foley & Lardner LLP

600 Congress Ave., Suite 3000

Austin, TX 78701

Jake Hicks

Attorney at Foley & Lardner LLP

1000 Louisiana St, Suite 2000

Houston, TX 77002

Davis G Mosmeyer, III

Attorney at Foley Lardner LLP

2021 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 1600

Dallas, TX 75201

Gary D Elliston

Attorney at DeHay & Elliston LLP

901 Main Street, Suite 3500

Dallas, TX 75202

Kay Barnes Baxter

Attorney at Foley & Mansfield PLLP

605 Poydras St, Suite 2450

New Orleans, LA 70130

Stephanie Lynn Spardone

Attorney at Hawkins Parnell Thackston & Young

4514 Cole Avenue, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75205

Mary Elizondo Frazier

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings, LLP

600 Travis Street, Suite 4800

Houston, TX 77002

Jeffrey Stewart Davis

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

600 Travis Street, Suite 4800

Houston, TX 77002

Joseph Anthony Ernest D Mansilla

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

1201 Elm Street, Suite 4400

Dallas, TX 75270

Saira Siddiqui

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

Chase Tower, 600 Travis Street, Suite 4800

Houston, TX 77002

28 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#118

(#118) REPLY filed by Naomi Wisener re: #89 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Peterson, Holly) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

#117

(#117) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Holly Christine Peterson on behalf of Naomi Wisener. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Peterson, Holly) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

#116

(#116) RESPONSE filed by Revlon Consumer Products Corp re: #89 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Solomon, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

#115

(#115) Confirmation of Consent to Removal filed by Avon Products Inc (Baxter, Kay) Modified event text on 12/17/2021 (jmg). (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#114

(#114) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Avon Products Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Natura & Co. for Avon Products Inc. (Baxter, Kay) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#113

(#113) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Avon Products Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Baxter, Kay) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#112

(#112) Designation of Local Counsel filed by Bayer Consumer Care Holdings LLC, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Dr. Scholl's LLC, Scholl's Wellness Company LLC. (Ellis, Gary) Modified text on 12/15/2021 (jmg). Modified text on 12/15/2021 (mjr). (Entered: 12/15/2021)

89 #1

Proposed Order

#89

(#116) RESPONSE filed by Revlon Consumer Products Corp re: #89 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Solomon, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

1 #13

Proposed Order

1 #9

Exhibit(s)

1 #8

Exhibit(s)

1 #6

Exhibit(s)

1 #4

Exhibit(s)

1 #3

Exhibit(s)

1 #2

Exhibit(s)

1 #1

Exhibit(s)

#1

(#8) NOTICE of Defendants L'Oreal USA, Inc. and Maybelline, LLC's Consent to Removal re: #1 Notice of Removal,,,,, filed by L'Oreal USA Inc, Maybelline LLC (Miller, Matthew) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

139 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#118) REPLY filed by Naomi Wisener re: #89 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Peterson, Holly) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#117) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Holly Christine Peterson on behalf of Naomi Wisener. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Peterson, Holly) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#116) RESPONSE filed by Revlon Consumer Products Corp re: #89 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Solomon, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#115) Confirmation of Consent to Removal filed by Avon Products Inc (Baxter, Kay) Modified event text on 12/17/2021 (jmg). (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#114) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Avon Products Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Natura & Co. for Avon Products Inc. (Baxter, Kay) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#113) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Avon Products Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Baxter, Kay) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#112) Designation of Local Counsel filed by Bayer Consumer Care Holdings LLC, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Dr. Scholl's LLC, Scholl's Wellness Company LLC. (Ellis, Gary) Modified text on 12/15/2021 (jmg). Modified text on 12/15/2021 (mjr). (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#111) Confirmation of Consent of Removal filed by Bayer Consumer Care Holdings LLC, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Dr. Scholl's LLC, Scholl's Wellness Company LLC. (Ellis, Gary) Modified text on 12/15/2021 (jmg). Modified text on 12/15/2021 (mjr). (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#110) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bayer Consumer Care Holdings LLC, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Dr. Scholl's LLC, Scholl's Wellness Company LLC. (Ellis, Gary) Modified text on 12/15/2021 (mjr). (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#109) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Bayer Consumer Care Holdings LLC, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Dr. Scholl's LLC, Scholl's Wellness Company LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Gary Joe Ellis added to party Bayer Consumer Care Holdings LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Gary Joe Ellis added to party Bayer Healthcare LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Gary Joe Ellis added to party Dr. Scholl's LLC(pty:dft) (Ellis, Gary) Modified text on 12/15/2021 (mjr). (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
108 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Defendants L'Oreal USA, Inc. and Maybelline, LLC's Consent to Removal re: #1 Notice of Removal,,,,, filed by L'Oreal USA Inc, Maybelline LLC (Miller, Matthew) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew R Miller on behalf of L'Oreal USA Inc, Maybelline LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Miller, Matthew) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Wed Nov 3 13:09:21 CDT 2021 (crt) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC ORDER: Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to respond to Defendant Revlon Consumer Products Company's argument, as set forth in its Notice of Removal (Doc. 1), that Defendants H-E-B, LP and Brookshire Grocery Company are improperly joined. Plaintiff must make her responsive filing by no later than 11/29/2021. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 11/3/2021) (chmb) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Mon Nov 1 09:45:53 CDT 2021 (crt) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jmg) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Elizabeth Arden, Inc. (Solomon, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Elizabeth Arden, Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Kimberly Erin Solomon added to party Elizabeth Arden, Inc(pty:dft) (Solomon, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Revlon Consumer Products Corp. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Solomon, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Revlon Consumer Products Corp. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12341886) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s), #11 Cover Sheet, #12 Cover Sheet Supplement, #13 Proposed Order) (Solomon, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MSD Consumer Care Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Aventis is a litigant

Latest cases where Elizabeth Arden Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where BAYER CONSUMER CARE HOLDINGS LLC, F/K/A BAYER CONSUMER CARE LLC F/K/A MSD CONSUMER CARE, INC. is a litigant