This case was last updated from PACER on 09/09/2019 at 07:45:40 (UTC).

Wiseley v. Stevens

Case Summary

On 07/11/2019 Wiseley filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Stevens. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Dakota District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey L. Viken. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-05047

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Dakota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey L. Viken

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Wiseley

Winner, SD 57580

Defendant

Matthew T. Stevens

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Wiseley. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Inmate Bank Transaction List) (CLR) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983). (SRA) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT pursuant to 42:1983 - Prisoner Civil Rights filed by Michael Wiseley. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Supreme Court Documents, #2 Attachment 2 - Jail Phone Records) (CLR) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

2 #1

Attachment Inmate Bank Transaction List

1 #2

Attachment 2 - Jail Phone Records

#7

(#7) MOTION to Stay by Michael Wiseley. (JLS) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

1 #1

Attachment 1 - Supreme Court Documents

#6

(#6) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Michael Wiseley. (DJP) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Stay by Michael Wiseley. (JLS) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Michael Wiseley. (DJP) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983). (SRA) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PRISONER Trust Account Report. (TAL) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • (#3) NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: The Clerks Office has received your Civil Rights Complaint together with an Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees and Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury. Although a new case has been opened, your application to proceed without prepayment of fees may be denied unless you return the enclosed Prisoner Trust Account Report (to be completed by the institution where you are incarcerated.) Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. (CLR) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Wiseley. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Inmate Bank Transaction List) (CLR) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT pursuant to 42:1983 - Prisoner Civil Rights filed by Michael Wiseley. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Supreme Court Documents, #2 Attachment 2 - Jail Phone Records) (CLR) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.