This case was last updated from PACER on 12/05/2020 at 09:41:56 (UTC).

Wise v. The Franklin Johnston Group

Case Summary

On 10/06/2020 Wise filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against The Franklin Johnston Group. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patricia A. Sullivan and John J. McConnell, Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00432

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rhode Island District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Patricia A. Sullivan

Presiding Judge

John J. McConnell, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joyce Wise

Defendant

The Franklin Johnston Group

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

V. Edward Formisano

Attorney at Formisano & Company, P.C.

100 Midway Place, Suite 1

Cranston, RI 02920-5707

Michael D. Pushee

Attorney at Formisano & Company, P.C.

100 Midway Place, Suite 1

Cranston, RI 02920-5707

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Joint STIPULATION re #1 Complaint [Joint Stipulation of Dismissal] filed by The Franklin Johnston Group. (Stein, Callan) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

#7

(#7) Second STIPULATION re #1 Complaint (Joint Stipulation) to Extend Time to Permit Parties to Finalize Settlement Agreement filed by The Franklin Johnston Group. (Stein, Callan) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#6

(#6) Joint STIPULATION re #1 Complaint to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by The Franklin Johnston Group. (Stein, Callan) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joyce Wise. The Franklin Johnston Group served on 10/8/2020, answer due 10/29/2020. (Formisano, V.) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to The Franklin Johnston Group. (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Request filed by Joyce Wise. (Formisano, V.) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

#2

(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1556334 ), filed by Joyce Wise. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Formisano, V.) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER entering #8 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice - So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 11/19/2020. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint STIPULATION re #1 Complaint [Joint Stipulation of Dismissal] filed by The Franklin Johnston Group. (Stein, Callan) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER entering #7 Stipulation to extend time to 11/27/20 for defendants to answer complaint or finalize settlement - So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 11/12/2020. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Second STIPULATION re #1 Complaint (Joint Stipulation) to Extend Time to Permit Parties to Finalize Settlement Agreement filed by The Franklin Johnston Group. (Stein, Callan) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER entering #6 Stipulation to extend time to answer; Reset Deadlines: The Franklin Johnston Group answer or responsive pleading due 11/12/2020 - So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/26/2020. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Joint STIPULATION re #1 Complaint to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by The Franklin Johnston Group. (Stein, Callan) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joyce Wise. The Franklin Johnston Group served on 10/8/2020, answer due 10/29/2020. (Formisano, V.) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to The Franklin Johnston Group. (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Request filed by Joyce Wise. (Formisano, V.) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1556334 ), filed by Joyce Wise. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Formisano, V.) (Attachment 1 replaced with flattened, signed version on 10/7/2020) (Hicks, Alyson). (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1556334 ), filed by Joyce Wise. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Formisano, V.) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less