This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/06/2019 at 08:02:23 (UTC).

Wiscovitch-Rentas v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 07/08/2019 Wiscovitch-Rentas filed a Bankruptcy - Withdrawal lawsuit against Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Aida M. Delgado-Colon and William G. Young. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01651

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Withdrawal

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Aida M. Delgado-Colon

William G. Young

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Noreen Wiscovitch-Rentas

San Juan, PR 00918

Debtor

Fiddler Gonzalez & Rodriguez, P.S.C.

Defendants

Conjugal Partnership Sosa-Lozano

Jose Acosta-Grubb

Conjugal Partnership Bimbela-Aldebol

Janet Navarrete

Maria I. Santos-Rivera

Emily Arean

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

Conjugal Partnership Silva-Navarrete

Diana Lozano

Jane Doe

Conjugal Partnership Acosta-Reyes

Jose A. Sosa-Llorens

San Juan, PR 00901-1969

Charles A. Bimbela

Conjugal Partnership Alvarez-Deal

Maria Santos

Waleska Mora-Aldebol

Juan C. Perez-Otero

Pedro Manzano-Yates

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Noreen Wiscovitch-Rentas

Attorney at Noreen Wiscovitch Rentas Law Office

400 Kalaf St.

San Juan, PR 00918

Javier Vilarino-Santiago

Attorney at Vilarino & Associates LLC

Po Box 9022515

San Juan, PR 00902-2515

Defendant Attorneys

Jose Alberto Sosa-Llorens

Attorney at DLA Piper (Puerto Rico) LLC

Ochoa Bldg. Suite 401, 500 Tanca St

San Juan, PR 00901-1969

Luis M. Rodriguez-Lopez

Attorney at CJ Legal Services PSC

Po Box 70250, Suite 279

San Juan, PR 00936

Myrna L. Ruiz-Olmo

Attorney at MRO Attorneys at Law, LLC

Po Box 367819

San Juan, PR 00936-7819

Carmen D. Conde-Torres

Attorney at C. Conde & Mirandes

1431 Ponce De Leon, Suite 401

San Juan, PR 00907-4033

Briseida Delgado-Miranda

Attorney at Delgado Miranda Law Office

130 Winston Churchill Ave Suite 1

San Juan, PR 00926

Bayoan Muniz-Calderon

Attorney at Saldana, Carvajal & Velez-Rive, PSC.

166 Constitucion Ave.

San Juan, PR 00901

Luisa S. Valle-Castro

Attorney at C. Conde & Mirandes

1431 Ponce De Leon, Suite 401

San Juan, PR 00907-4033

Manuel Fernandez-Bared

Attorney at Toro, Colon, Mullet, PSC

Po Box 195383

San Juan, PR 00919-5383

Angel Sosa-Baez

Attorney at Toro, Colon, Mullet, PSC

Po Box 195383

San Juan, PR 00919-5383

Jorge I. Peirats

Attorney at Pietrantoni Mendez & Alvarez LLC

Popular Center, 19Th Floor, 208 Ponce De Leon Ave.

San Juan, PR 00918

Other Attorneys

Sergio A. Ramirez-De-Arellano

Attorney at Sergio A. Ramirez de Arrellano Law Office

Banco Popular Center Suite 1022, 209 Munoz Rivera Ave.

San Juan, PR 00918-1009

 

Court Documents

15 #1

Supplement CM/ECF Recipients

#15

(#15) ***FILED IN ERROR. Counsel filed using another counsel's login/password. To be re-filed.*** REPLY to Response to Motion Bankr. Dkt. Nos. 98,99,101,104,157 and District Court Dkt. Nos. 2,3, 4,5, 6, 7,8, 9,10 and 11 filed by Noreen Wiscovitch-Rentas Re: #9 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Pro Hac Vice Admission and Request for Issuance of CM/ECF Credentials filed by Noreen Wiscovitch-Rentas, #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference, #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Jose A. Sosa-Llorens, Conjugal Partnership Sosa-Lozano, #11 MOTION for Joinder to Oppositions to Motion for Withdrawal of Reference and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Jose A. Sosa-Llorens, #3 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding /MOTION TO INFORM PENDING OBJECTION TO JURY TRIAL BEFORE BANKRUPTCY COURT/ filed by Conjugal Partnership Silva-Navarrete, Pedro Manzano-Yates, Conjugal Partnership Manzano-Juarbe, Carmen Juarbe, Jose A. Silva-Cofresi, Janet Navarrete, #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Opposition to Jury Demand and Request for Withdrawal of the Reference and Request for Hearing Thereon filed by Noreen Wiscovitch-Rentas, #14 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Noreen Wiscovitch-Rentas, #4 MOTION for Joinder filed by Maria I. Santos-Rivera filed by Noreen Wiscovitch-Rentas. (Attachments: #1 Supplement CM/ECF Recipients)(Wiscovitch-Rentas, Noreen) Modified on 9/3/2019 (gav). (Entered: 08/30/2019)

#14

(#14) ***FILED IN ERROR. Counsel filed using another counsel's login/password. To be re-filed.*** MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Noreen Wiscovitch-Rentas on behalf of Noreen Wiscovitch-Rentas Responses due by 9/13/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Wiscovitch-Rentas, Noreen) Modified on 9/3/2019 (gav). (Entered: 08/30/2019)

#11

(#11) MOTION for Joinder to Oppositions to Motion for Withdrawal of Reference and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Luis M. Rodriguez-Lopez on behalf of Jose A. Sosa-Llorens Responses due by 9/3/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-Lopez, Luis) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

#9

(#9) INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Pro Hac Vice Admission and Request for Issuance of CM/ECF Credentials filed by Javier Vilarino-Santiago on behalf of Noreen Wiscovitch-Rentas Responses due by 8/14/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vilarino-Santiago, Javier) Modified on 8/1/2019 to remove caps (rom). (Entered: 07/31/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance and to Request Second and Final Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint or Otherwise Plead, Oppose Jury Trial, Oppose Withdrawal of the Reference and/or any Other Matter or Deadline that Become Due Counted From the Issuance of Summons by Luis M. Rodriguez-Lopez on behalf of Conjugal Partnership Sosa-Lozano, Jose A. Sosa-Llorens (Rodriguez-Lopez, Luis) Modified on 7/30/2019 to edit event (rom). (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#3

(#3) INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Pending Objection to Jury Trial Before Bankruptcy Court filed by Carmen D. Conde-Torres on behalf of Conjugal Partnership Manzano-Juarbe, Conjugal Partnership Silva-Navarrete, Carmen Juarbe, Pedro Manzano-Yates, Janet Navarrete, Jose A. Silva-Cofresi Responses due by 8/6/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Conde-Torres, Carmen) Modified on 7/24/2019 to remove caps (rom). (Entered: 07/23/2019)

1 #82

Docket 100

1 #81

Docket 111

1 #80

Docket 109

1 #47

Docket 48

1 #46

Docket 47

1 #45

Docket 46

1 #44

Docket 45

1 #43

Docket 44

1 #42

Docket 43

1 #41

Docket 42

#1

(#1) Transmittal to District Court of Withdrawal of Reference. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Docket Sheet, #3 Docket 1, #4 Docket 3, #5 Docket 4, #6 Docket 5, #7 Docket 6, #8 Docket 7, #9 Docket 8, #10 Docket 9, #11 Docket 10, #12 Docket 11, #13 Docket 12, #14 Docket 13, #15 Docket 14, #16 Docket 15, #17 Docket 16, #18 Docket 17, #19 Docket 18, #20 Docket 19, #21 Docket 20, #22 Docket 21, #23 Docket 22, #24 Docket 23, #25 Docket 24, #26 Docket 25, #27 Docket 26, #28 Docket 27, #29 Docket 28, #30 Docket 29, #31 Docket 30, #32 Docket 31, #33 Docket 34, #34 Docket 35, #35 Docket 36, #36 Docket 37, #37 Docket 38, #38 Docket 39, #39 Docket 40, #40 Docket 41), #41 Docket 42, #42 Docket 43, #43 Docket 44, #44 Docket 45, #45 Docket 46, #46 Docket 47, #47 Docket 48, #48 Docket 49 #49, Docket 50, #50 Docket 51, #51 Docket 52, #52 Docket 53, #53 Docket 54, #54 Docket 55, #55 Docket 56, #56 Docket 57, #57 Docket 58, #58 Docket 59, #59 Docket 60, #60 Docket 61, #61 Docket 62, #62 Docket 85, #63 Docket 87, #64 Docket 88, #65 Docket 89, #66 Docket 90, #67 Docket 92, #68 Docket 93, #69 Docket 94, #70 Docket 98, #71 Docket 99, #72 Docket 101, #73 Docket 102, #74 Docket 103, #75 Docket 104, #76 Docket 105, #77 Docket 106, #78 Docket 107, #79 Docket 108, #80 Docket 109, #81 Docket 111, #82 Docket 100) (rom). (Entered: 07/10/2019)

87 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #15 Reply to Response to Motion. ***FILED IN ERROR. Counsel filed using another counsel's login/password. To be re-filed.*** (gav) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #14 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages . ***FILED IN ERROR. Counsel filed using another counsel's login/password. To be re-filed.*** (gav) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ***FILED IN ERROR. Counsel filed using another counsel's login/password. To be re-filed.*** REPLY to Response to Motion Bankr. Dkt. Nos. 98,99,101,104,157 and District Court Dkt. Nos. 2,3, 4,5, 6, 7,8, 9,10 and 11 filed by Noreen Wiscovitch-Rentas Re: #9 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Pro Hac Vice Admission and Request for Issuance of CM/ECF Credentials filed by Noreen Wiscovitch-Rentas, #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference, #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Jose A. Sosa-Llorens, Conjugal Partnership Sosa-Lozano, #11 MOTION for Joinder to Oppositions to Motion for Withdrawal of Reference and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Jose A. Sosa-Llorens, #3 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding /MOTION TO INFORM PENDING OBJECTION TO JURY TRIAL BEFORE BANKRUPTCY COURT/ filed by Conjugal Partnership Silva-Navarrete, Pedro Manzano-Yates, Conjugal Partnership Manzano-Juarbe, Carmen Juarbe, Jose A. Silva-Cofresi, Janet Navarrete, #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Opposition to Jury Demand and Request for Withdrawal of the Reference and Request for Hearing Thereon filed by Noreen Wiscovitch-Rentas, #14 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Noreen Wiscovitch-Rentas, #4 MOTION for Joinder filed by Maria I. Santos-Rivera filed by Noreen Wiscovitch-Rentas. (Attachments: #1 Supplement CM/ECF Recipients)(Wiscovitch-Rentas, Noreen) Modified on 9/3/2019 (gav). (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ***FILED IN ERROR. Counsel filed using another counsel's login/password. To be re-filed.*** MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Noreen Wiscovitch-Rentas on behalf of Noreen Wiscovitch-Rentas Responses due by 9/13/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Wiscovitch-Rentas, Noreen) Modified on 9/3/2019 (gav). (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • (#13) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case has been transferred to the docket of Judge William G. Young. Signed by Chief Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 08/30/2019.(ft) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION to dismiss as to Noreen Wiscovitch-Rentas filed by Luis M. Rodriguez-Lopez on behalf of Jose A. Sosa-Llorens Responses due by 9/3/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-Lopez, Luis) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION for Joinder to Oppositions to Motion for Withdrawal of Reference and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Luis M. Rodriguez-Lopez on behalf of Jose A. Sosa-Llorens Responses due by 9/3/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-Lopez, Luis) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Withdraw filed by Jose Julian Alvarez, Charles A. Bimbela, Conjugal Partnership Alvarez-Deal, Mary Deal Re: #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by Jose Julian Alvarez, Charles A. Bimbela, Conjugal Partnership Alvarez-Deal, Mary Deal. (Sosa-Baez, Angel) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Pro Hac Vice Admission and Request for Issuance of CM/ECF Credentials filed by Javier Vilarino-Santiago on behalf of Noreen Wiscovitch-Rentas Responses due by 8/14/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vilarino-Santiago, Javier) Modified on 8/1/2019 to remove caps (rom). (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Opposition to Jury Demand and Request for Withdrawal of the Reference and Request for Hearing Thereon filed by Javier Vilarino-Santiago on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 8/13/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vilarino-Santiago, Javier) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance and to Request Second and Final Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint or Otherwise Plead, Oppose Jury Trial, Oppose Withdrawal of the Reference and/or any Other Matter or Deadline that Become Due Counted From the Issuance of Summons by Luis M. Rodriguez-Lopez on behalf of Conjugal Partnership Sosa-Lozano, Jose A. Sosa-Llorens (Rodriguez-Lopez, Luis) Modified on 7/30/2019 to edit event (rom). (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion Opposition to Jury Demand and to Request for Withdrawal of the Reference filed by Emily Arean, Conjugal Partnership Arean-Negron, Eduardo Negron-Navas Re: #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by Emily Arean, Conjugal Partnership Arean-Negron, Eduardo Negron-Navas. (Ruiz-Olmo, Myrna) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion Opposition to Jury Demand and to Request for Withdrawal of the Reference filed by Jose Acosta-Grubb Re: #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by Jose Acosta-Grubb. (Ruiz-Olmo, Myrna) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Motion for Joinder to Opposition to Jury Demand and to Request for Withdrawal of the Reference (Dockets #1 & 2) filed by Maria I. Santos-Rivera Re: #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by Maria I. Santos-Rivera. (Delgado-Miranda, Briseida) Modified on 7/24/2019 to edit event (rom). (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Pending Objection to Jury Trial Before Bankruptcy Court filed by Carmen D. Conde-Torres on behalf of Conjugal Partnership Manzano-Juarbe, Conjugal Partnership Silva-Navarrete, Carmen Juarbe, Pedro Manzano-Yates, Janet Navarrete, Jose A. Silva-Cofresi Responses due by 8/6/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Conde-Torres, Carmen) Modified on 7/24/2019 to remove caps (rom). (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion Opposition to Jury Demand and to Request for Withdrawal of the Reference filed by Ricardo L. Ortiz-Colon Re: #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by Ricardo L. Ortiz-Colon. (Delgado-Miranda, Briseida) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Transmittal to District Court of Withdrawal of Reference. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Docket Sheet, #3 Docket 1, #4 Docket 3, #5 Docket 4, #6 Docket 5, #7 Docket 6, #8 Docket 7, #9 Docket 8, #10 Docket 9, #11 Docket 10, #12 Docket 11, #13 Docket 12, #14 Docket 13, #15 Docket 14, #16 Docket 15, #17 Docket 16, #18 Docket 17, #19 Docket 18, #20 Docket 19, #21 Docket 20, #22 Docket 21, #23 Docket 22, #24 Docket 23, #25 Docket 24, #26 Docket 25, #27 Docket 26, #28 Docket 27, #29 Docket 28, #30 Docket 29, #31 Docket 30, #32 Docket 31, #33 Docket 34, #34 Docket 35, #35 Docket 36, #36 Docket 37, #37 Docket 38, #38 Docket 39, #39 Docket 40, #40 Docket 41), #41 Docket 42, #42 Docket 43, #43 Docket 44, #44 Docket 45, #45 Docket 46, #46 Docket 47, #47 Docket 48, #48 Docket 49 #49, Docket 50, #50 Docket 51, #51 Docket 52, #52 Docket 53, #53 Docket 54, #54 Docket 55, #55 Docket 56, #56 Docket 57, #57 Docket 58, #58 Docket 59, #59 Docket 60, #60 Docket 61, #61 Docket 62, #62 Docket 85, #63 Docket 87, #64 Docket 88, #65 Docket 89, #66 Docket 90, #67 Docket 92, #68 Docket 93, #69 Docket 94, #70 Docket 98, #71 Docket 99, #72 Docket 101, #73 Docket 102, #74 Docket 103, #75 Docket 104, #76 Docket 105, #77 Docket 106, #78 Docket 107, #79 Docket 108, #80 Docket 109, #81 Docket 111, #82 Docket 100) (rom). (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIDDLER GONZALEZ & RODRIGUEZ, P.S.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sergio A. Ramirez-De-Arellano